Panmure Investments Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 09 Nov 2001. 9429036736898 is the business number it was issued. The company has been run by 9 directors: Glendyn Donald Carter - an active director whose contract began on 09 Nov 2001,
Ross Wilson Blue - an active director whose contract began on 09 Nov 2001,
Jocelyn Cooney - an active director whose contract began on 05 Jul 2007,
Murray Gordon Wells - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 Nov 2001 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2019,
Rodger Corkill - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 Nov 2001 and was terminated on 06 Dec 2017.
Updated on 17 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 156 Eden Street, Oamaru, Oamaru, 9400 (types include: physical, registered).
Panmure Investments Limited had been using 343 Thames Highway, Oamaru as their physical address up to 25 Aug 2017.
A total of 15070 shares are allocated to 15 shareholders (8 groups). The first group is comprised of 1000 shares (6.64%) held by 2 entities. Next there is the second group which consists of 4 shareholders in control of 2000 shares (13.27%). Finally there is the next share allotment (2500 shares 16.59%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous address
Address: 343 Thames Highway, Oamaru New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Nov 2001 to 25 Aug 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 15070
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 14 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Efs Trust (rp) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041189764 |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
18 Jun 2018 - |
Individual | Gray, Richard Carlyle |
Te Awamutu |
09 Nov 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 2000 | |||
Individual | Ladd, Colin John |
Rd 1 Waitoa 3380 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2013 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Ncd Trustees (sunshine) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032184761 |
Hamilton New Zealand |
14 Nov 2018 - |
Individual | Ross, Maylene |
Rd 2 Hamilton 3282 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2013 - |
Individual | Sandford, Beverley Ann |
Thames Thames 3500 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 2500 | |||
Other (Other) | Neil Park Partnership |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
01 Apr 2019 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 2000 | |||
Individual | Wynyard, Gezina Theresia |
Maeroa Hamilton 3200 New Zealand |
02 Sep 2015 - |
Individual | Cooney, Jocelyn |
Cambridge New Zealand |
09 Nov 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Blue, Christine Helen |
Ellerslie Auckland 1060 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 1570 | |||
Individual | Carter, Alison Frances |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3118 New Zealand |
11 Apr 2016 - |
Individual | Carter, Glendyn Donald |
Huntington Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
16 Aug 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #7 Number of Shares: 3000 | |||
Individual | Carter, Glendyn Donald |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3118 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2001 - |
Individual | Carter, Alison Frances |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3118 New Zealand |
11 Apr 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #8 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Blue, Ross Wilson |
Ellerslie Auckland 1060 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2001 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Wells, Murray Gordon |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2001 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Entity | Dti Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030242739 Company Number: 4427138 |
Hamilton 3240 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2013 - 14 Nov 2018 |
Individual | Mak, Eugene Alexander |
7 Saint Vincent Avenue Remuera, Auckland |
09 Nov 2001 - 16 Aug 2005 |
Individual | Corkill, Rodger |
Rd3 Ohaupo New Zealand |
16 Aug 2005 - 25 Jan 2013 |
Individual | Carter, Evan Francis |
Hamilton |
09 Nov 2001 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Individual | Ladd, Betty Helen |
Thames Thames 3500 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2001 - 31 Oct 2013 |
Individual | Mak, Eugene Alexander |
7 Saint Vincent Avenue Remuera, Auckland |
09 Nov 2001 - 16 Aug 2005 |
Individual | Mak, Estate Of Alge |
7 Saint Vincent Avenue Remuera, Auckland 0000 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2001 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Entity | Dti Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030242739 Company Number: 4427138 |
Hamilton 3240 New Zealand |
31 Oct 2013 - 14 Nov 2018 |
Individual | Corkill, Mary |
Rd3 Ohaupo New Zealand |
16 Aug 2005 - 25 Jan 2013 |
Individual | Corkill, Rodger |
Rd3 Ohaupo New Zealand |
16 Aug 2005 - 25 Jan 2013 |
Individual | Corkill, Mary |
Rd3 Ohaupo New Zealand |
16 Aug 2005 - 25 Jan 2013 |
Individual | Ladd, Ronald Walter |
Thames Thames 3500 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2001 - 10 Aug 2018 |
Individual | Ladd, Ronald Walter |
Thames Thames 3500 New Zealand |
09 Nov 2001 - 10 Aug 2018 |
Individual | Pitcairn, Robert John |
New Plymouth |
09 Nov 2001 - 18 Jun 2018 |
Individual | Carter, Evan Francis |
Hamilton |
09 Nov 2001 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Individual | De Blaauw, Terence |
Rototuna Hamilton New Zealand |
28 May 2007 - 02 Sep 2015 |
Glendyn Donald Carter - Director
Appointment date: 09 Nov 2001
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3118 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Nov 2021
Address: Huntington, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2015
Ross Wilson Blue - Director
Appointment date: 09 Nov 2001
Address: Ellerslie, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2021
Address: Pakuranga, Auckland, 0000 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2015
Jocelyn Cooney - Director
Appointment date: 05 Jul 2007
Address: Cambridge, 3493 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Apr 2018
Address: Cambridge, Cambridge, 0000 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2015
Murray Gordon Wells - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Nov 2001
Termination date: 31 Mar 2019
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Mar 2018
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2015
Rodger Corkill - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Nov 2001
Termination date: 06 Dec 2017
Address: Rd 3, Ohaupo, 0000 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2015
Maylene Ross - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Oct 2013
Termination date: 08 Sep 2016
Address: Rd 2, Hamilton, 3282 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Oct 2013
Ronald Walter Ladd - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Nov 2001
Termination date: 29 Aug 2013
Address: Thames, Thames, 3500 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2013
Tarlochan Singh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Nov 2001
Termination date: 13 Jul 2007
Address: Haultain Downs, Rd 1, Hamilton,
Address used since 09 Nov 2001
Veronica Smit - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Nov 2001
Termination date: 18 Aug 2006
Address: Cambridge,
Address used since 09 Nov 2001
Anaro Group Limited
156 Eden Street
Corniche Holdings Limited
156 Eden Street
Kyburn Investments Limited
156 Eden Street
Brinkburn Investments Limited
156 Eden Street
Five & Ten Investments Limited
156 Eden Street
Deane Holdings Limited
156 Eden Street