Gh Properties Limited was launched on 12 Dec 2001 and issued a number of 9429036696833. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Timothy Derrick Gould - an active director whose contract began on 12 Dec 2001,
Jonathan Rhodes Hutton - an active director whose contract began on 12 Dec 2001.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 04 Aug 2024), this company filed 1 address: 39 George Street, Timaru, Timaru, 7910 (types include: physical, service).
Until 24 May 2011, Gh Properties Limited had been using Hc Partners Limited, 39 George Street, Timaru 7910 as their registered address.
A total of 5001000 shares are issued to 3 groups (9 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 1250250 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Gould, Timothy Derrick (an individual) located at Lyttelton, Lyttelton postcode 8082,
Hutton, Jonathan Rhodes (an individual) located at Avonhead, Christchurch postcode 8042.
The 2nd group consists of 4 shareholders, holds 25 per cent shares (exactly 1250250 shares) and includes
Hutton, Jonathan Rhodes - located at Avonhead, Christchurch,
Gould, Timothy Derrick - located at Lyttelton, Lyttelton,
Gould, Timothy Derrick - located at Lyttelton, Lyttelton.
The 3rd share allocation (1250250 shares, 25%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Hutton, Jonathan Rhodes, located at Avonhead, Christchurch (an individual),
Gould, Timothy Derrick, located at Lyttelton, Lyttelton (an individual),
Wolffenbuttel, Paul, located at Gleniti, Timaru (an individual).
Previous addresses
Address: Hc Partners Limited, 39 George Street, Timaru 7910 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Jun 2010 to 24 May 2011
Address: Hubbard Churcher & Co, 39 George Street, Timaru
Registered & physical address used from 15 May 2005 to 01 Jun 2010
Address: C/- Hubbard Churcher, 39 George Street, Timaru
Physical & registered address used from 12 Dec 2001 to 15 May 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 5001000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 03 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1250250 | |||
Individual | Gould, Timothy Derrick |
Lyttelton Lyttelton 8082 New Zealand |
12 Dec 2001 - |
Individual | Hutton, Jonathan Rhodes |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
31 May 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1250250 | |||
Individual | Hutton, Jonathan Rhodes |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
31 May 2004 - |
Individual | Gould, Timothy Derrick |
Lyttelton Lyttelton 8082 New Zealand |
31 May 2004 - |
Individual | Gould, Timothy Derrick |
Lyttelton Lyttelton 8082 New Zealand |
12 Dec 2001 - |
Individual | Hutton, Jonathan Rhodes |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
12 Dec 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1250250 | |||
Individual | Hutton, Jonathan Rhodes |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
31 May 2004 - |
Individual | Gould, Timothy Derrick |
Lyttelton Lyttelton 8082 New Zealand |
12 Dec 2001 - |
Individual | Wolffenbuttel, Paul |
Gleniti Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
10 Jun 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Saunders, Geoffrey Childers |
Willowcreek Lane Northwood, Christchurch 8051 New Zealand |
31 May 2004 - 10 Jun 2019 |
Individual | Joseph, John Lindsay |
St Albans Christchurch 8014 New Zealand |
31 May 2004 - 15 Mar 2019 |
Timothy Derrick Gould - Director
Appointment date: 12 Dec 2001
Address: Lyttelton, Lyttelton, 8082 New Zealand
Address used since 03 May 2024
Address: Rd 1, Belfast, 7670 New Zealand
Address used since 25 May 2010
Jonathan Rhodes Hutton - Director
Appointment date: 12 Dec 2001
Address: Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 19 May 2014
Piccolo Bambino Limited
39 George Street
Wurmitzer Surgical Limited
39 George Street
Heigold Motors Limited
39 George Street
Silver Star Designs Limited
39 George Street
Gladstone Bar Limited
39 George Street
Mcintosh Catering Limited
39 George Street