Franston Timber Concepts Limited, a registered company, was launched on 12 Feb 2002. 9429036628636 is the number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 3 directors: Winston Robin Francis Carter - an active director whose contract began on 12 Feb 2002,
Pauline Mary Carter - an active director whose contract began on 27 Nov 2006,
Franz John Carter - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Feb 2002 and was terminated on 27 Nov 2006.
Last updated on 25 Jan 2022, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 30A Remuera Settlement Road, Rd 2, Kaikohe, 0472 (type: registered, physical).
Franston Timber Concepts Limited had been using 31 Riddell Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri as their physical address until 14 Jul 2020.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: 31 Riddell Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 05 Aug 2014 to 14 Jul 2020
Address: 13 Access Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Jul 2010 to 05 Aug 2014
Address: 149 Wiroa Road, Rd 3, Kerikeri New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 Aug 2007 to 08 Jul 2010
Address: 94 Guildford Drive, Paraparaumu 5032
Physical address used from 03 Aug 2006 to 02 Aug 2007
Address: 94 Guildford Drive, Paraparaumu
Registered address used from 03 Aug 2006 to 02 Aug 2007
Address: 2 Moa Road, Raumati Beach 6010
Physical & registered address used from 05 Aug 2003 to 03 Aug 2006
Address: 67 Amohia Street, Paraparaumu
Registered & physical address used from 12 Feb 2002 to 05 Aug 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 06 Jul 2021
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Pauline Mary Carter |
Rd 2 Kaikohe 0472 New Zealand |
12 Feb 2002 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Winston Robin Francis Carter |
Rd 2 Kaikohe 0472 New Zealand |
12 Feb 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Franz John Carter |
Papamoa |
12 Feb 2002 - 27 Jul 2006 |
Winston Robin Francis Carter - Director
Appointment date: 12 Feb 2002
Address: Rd 2, Kaikohe, 0472 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Jul 2020
Address: Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2014
Pauline Mary Carter - Director
Appointment date: 27 Nov 2006
Address: Rd 2, Kaikohe, 0472 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Jul 2020
Address: Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2014
Franz John Carter - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Feb 2002
Termination date: 27 Nov 2006
Address: Papamoa,
Address used since 27 Jul 2006
Mg & Mf Urlich Trustee Limited
27c Riddell Road
Casaranda Trustee Company Limited
52 Riddell Road
Claremont Properties (2004) Limited
24a Riddell Road
New Zealand Human Resources Limited
14 Urutawa Drive
Kerikeri Hockey Club Incorporated
4 Urutawa Drive
Gos Builders Limited
16 Urutawa Drive