Pauling Limited, a registered company, was launched on 18 Mar 2002. 9429036577910 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been run by 1 director, named Maree Helen Pauling - an active director whose contract began on 18 Mar 2002.
Last updated on 21 Jul 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: Unit 10, 42 Ormiston Road, Otara, Auckland, 2019 (types include: registered, service).
Pauling Limited had been using Ground Floor, 611 Great South Road, Manukau City, Auckland as their physical address up to 23 Feb 2018.
More names used by the company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 18 Mar 2002 to 03 Aug 2006 they were called Pauling & Co Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders (3 groups). The first group is comprised of 89 shares (89 per cent) held by 2 entities. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 10 shares (10 per cent). Lastly the next share allotment (1 share 1 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Ground Floor, 611 Great South Road, Manukau City, Auckland, 2104 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 20 Feb 2013 to 23 Feb 2018
Address #2: 61 Broomfields Road, Whitford, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Mar 2002 to 20 Feb 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 09 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 89 | |||
Individual | Pauling, James Matthew |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 New Zealand |
18 Mar 2002 - |
Individual | Pauling, Maree Helen |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 New Zealand |
25 Feb 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Pauling, Maree Helen |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 New Zealand |
18 Mar 2002 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Pauling, James Matthew |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 New Zealand |
18 Mar 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Other | The Trustees In The Cat Cruising Trust | 22 Mar 2007 - 22 Mar 2007 | |
Other | Null - The Trustees In The Cat Cruising Trust | 22 Mar 2007 - 22 Mar 2007 |
Maree Helen Pauling - Director
Appointment date: 18 Mar 2002
Address: Rd 1, Howick, 2571 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Feb 2010
Southern Legal Trustee Services Limited
611 Great South Road
Global Everyday Marketing Limited
Ground Floor
Alfa Distributions International (nz) Limited
Ground Floor, 611 Great South Road
2 V Limited
611 Great South Road
Sanpat Properties Limited
611 Great South Road
Pauling Trustee Company Limited
Ground Floor