Doctor Dditel Limited was registered on 12 Sep 2002 and issued a number of 9429036330843. This registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Susan Dianne Newman - an active director whose contract started on 12 Sep 2002,
John Ross Fraser Mclean - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 Sep 2002 and was terminated on 12 Feb 2010.
According to BizDb's database (updated on 24 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 2 Seahorse Place, Birkenhead, Auckland, 0626 (types include: postal, office).
Up until 14 Jul 2006, Doctor Dditel Limited had been using Earthstar Chartered Accountants Ltd, Level 1, 233 State Highway 17, Albany Village, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 200 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 200 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Newman, Susan Dianne (an individual) located at Beach Haven, Auckland postcode 0626. Doctor Dditel Limited was classified as "School - combined primary and secondary" (ANZSIC P802320).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 2 Seahorse Place, Beach Haven, Auckland, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Delivery address used from 09 May 2019
Principal place of activity
2 Seahorse Place, Beach Haven, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Earthstar Chartered Accountants Ltd, Level 1, 233 State Highway 17, Albany Village, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 23 Nov 2005 to 14 Jul 2006
Address #2: Level 8, 53 Fort Street, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 08 Sep 2003 to 23 Nov 2005
Address #3: Cox Arcus & Co Limited, 70 Shortland Street, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 12 Sep 2002 to 08 Sep 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 200
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 06 Jun 2021
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Individual | Newman, Susan Dianne |
Beach Haven Auckland 0626 New Zealand |
12 Sep 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mclean, John Ross Fraser |
Beach Haven Auckland New Zealand |
12 Sep 2002 - 06 Jul 2010 |
Susan Dianne Newman - Director
Appointment date: 12 Sep 2002
Address: Beach Haven, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2003
John Ross Fraser Mclean - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Sep 2002
Termination date: 12 Feb 2010
Address: Beach Haven, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Sep 2002
Kask Holdings Limited
3 Brigantine Drive
Peters Pies Limited
3 Brigantine Drive
Ak Capital Partners Limited
3 Brigantine Drive
B H And J Robb Trustee Limited
59 Hadfield Street
61 Autos Limited
61 Hadfield Street
Jumu Trustee Limited
61 Hadfield Street
Acg Strathallan Limited
Cider Building, Level 8
Acg Tauranga Limited
Cider Building, Level 8
Blair Consulting Limited
39 Deanna Drive
Spectrum Education Limited
18 Byron Avenue
The Inzone Experience Limited
Level 3a
The Tasty Tuck Shop Company Limited
41 Harbour View Road