Advice Plus Limited was incorporated on 23 Sep 2002 and issued a number of 9429036322060. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 4 directors: Jamie Ian Lester - an active director whose contract began on 04 Aug 2006,
Heath David Stuart Cleland - an active director whose contract began on 01 Oct 2007,
Cecilia Marion Farrow - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Oct 2007 and was terminated on 19 Sep 2012,
Cecilia Marion Farrow - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Sep 2002 and was terminated on 01 Oct 2007.
As stated in the BizDb database (updated on 04 Sep 2024), the company uses 4 addresses: 1 Airborne Road, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 (office address),
Po Box 300261, Albany, Auckland, 0752 (postal address),
1 Airborne Road, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 (delivery address),
1 Airborne Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (physical address) among others.
Up to 06 Nov 2007, Advice Plus Limited had been using Unit D, 44-46 Constellation Drive, Mairangi Bay, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb identified previous aliases used by the company: from 28 Mar 2007 to 19 Oct 2015 they were called A F S Limited, from 23 Sep 2002 to 28 Mar 2007 they were called Assurance Financial Services Limited.
A total of 150 shares are issued to 4 groups (7 shareholders in total). In the first group, 74 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Sw Trust Services (Eighteen) Limited (an entity) located at Takapuna, Auckland postcode 0622,
Lester, Jamie Ian (an individual) located at Northcote, Auckland postcode 0627.
The 2nd group consists of 3 shareholders, holds 49.33% shares (exactly 74 shares) and includes
Juniper Trustee Company Limited - located at East Tamaki, Auckland,
Cleland, Heath David Stuart - located at Northcote, Auckland,
Cleland, Jenni Louise - located at Northcote, Auckland.
The 3rd share allotment (1 share, 0.67%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Lester, Jamie Ian, located at Northcote, Auckland (an individual). Advice Plus Limited has been categorised as "Life insurance provision" (business classification K631010).
Other active addresses
Principal place of activity
1 Airborne Road, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Unit D, 44-46 Constellation Drive, Mairangi Bay, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 03 Sep 2003 to 06 Nov 2007
Address #2: Offices Of Campbell Forbes, 182 Great South Road, Remuera, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 08 Jul 2003 to 03 Sep 2003
Address #3: Offices Of Hudson Kasper, Level 3, Merial Building, Putney Way, Manukau City
Physical & registered address used from 23 Sep 2002 to 08 Jul 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 150
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 09 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 74 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Sw Trust Services (eighteen) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046516121 |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
14 Oct 2019 - |
Individual | Lester, Jamie Ian |
Northcote Auckland 0627 New Zealand |
29 Mar 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 74 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Juniper Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033611945 |
East Tamaki Auckland 2013 New Zealand |
10 Oct 2017 - |
Individual | Cleland, Heath David Stuart |
Northcote Auckland 0627 New Zealand |
15 Jan 2008 - |
Individual | Cleland, Jenni Louise |
Northcote Auckland 0627 New Zealand |
15 Jan 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Lester, Jamie Ian |
Northcote Auckland 0627 New Zealand |
29 Mar 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Cleland, Heath David Stuart |
Northcote Auckland 0627 New Zealand |
15 Jan 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Harford, Valerie Gaye |
Mission Bay Auckland |
20 Sep 2005 - 30 Oct 2007 |
Individual | Farrow, Wallace George |
R D 3 Albany |
05 Oct 2004 - 05 Oct 2004 |
Individual | Lester, Jacqueline Maree |
Albany Auckland New Zealand |
29 Mar 2007 - 14 Nov 2011 |
Entity | Wyndham Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037014643 Company Number: 1114468 |
Level 14, Hsbc Centre 1 Queen Street, Auckland City |
15 Jan 2008 - 10 Oct 2017 |
Entity | Mr Trustee Company 2010 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031541879 Company Number: 2482569 |
Parnell Auckland Null New Zealand |
14 Nov 2011 - 14 Oct 2019 |
Entity | Macky Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037183790 Company Number: 1052996 |
19 Apr 2007 - 14 Nov 2011 | |
Individual | Farrow, Cecilia Marion |
Rd 2 Albany 0792 New Zealand |
22 May 2015 - 02 Jun 2015 |
Individual | Roberton, Michael |
Parnell Auckland |
29 Mar 2007 - 29 Mar 2007 |
Entity | Wyndham Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037014643 Company Number: 1114468 |
15 Jan 2008 - 10 Oct 2017 | |
Individual | Farrow, Cecilia Marion |
Riverhead Albany |
20 Sep 2005 - 30 Oct 2007 |
Individual | Farrow, Wallace George |
Riverhead Auckland |
20 Sep 2005 - 30 Oct 2007 |
Entity | Macky Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037183790 Company Number: 1052996 |
19 Apr 2007 - 14 Nov 2011 | |
Entity | Mr Trustee Company 2010 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031541879 Company Number: 2482569 |
Parnell Auckland Null New Zealand |
14 Nov 2011 - 14 Oct 2019 |
Individual | Harford, Valerie Gaye |
Mission Bay Auckland |
05 Oct 2004 - 05 Oct 2004 |
Individual | Farrow, Cecilia Marion |
Riverhead |
23 Sep 2002 - 30 Oct 2007 |
Jamie Ian Lester - Director
Appointment date: 04 Aug 2006
Address: Northcote, Auckland, 0627 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Oct 2020
Address: Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Sep 2018
Address: Northcote, Auckland, 0627 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2013
Heath David Stuart Cleland - Director
Appointment date: 01 Oct 2007
Address: Northcote, North Shore City, 0627 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Sep 2009
Cecilia Marion Farrow - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Oct 2007
Termination date: 19 Sep 2012
Address: Rd 2, Albany, 0792 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Sep 2009
Cecilia Marion Farrow - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Sep 2002
Termination date: 01 Oct 2007
Address: R D 2, Albany,
Address used since 01 Mar 2007
House Of Fine Foods Limited
1 Airborne Road
Independent Trustees (new Zealand) Limited
2 Airborne Road
Garrison Trustee Limited
2 Airborne Road
Turley Family Trustee Company Limited
2 Airborne Road
Wellington College Old Boys (auckland) Charitable Trust
Ross Holmes Lawyers
Hibiscus Harbour L.p.
2 Airborne Road
Allsafeinsurance Limited
14d Baulcomb Parade
Atl Insurance Services Limited
Michael Eiberg Chartered Accountant
Belveder Limited
222 Main Road
Coast Advisers Limited
180 Greenhithe Road
Getalife Nz Limited
8 Vari Place
Lifeco Limited
68 Browns Bay Road