Jelts Limited, a registered company, was registered on 15 Oct 2002. 9429036283842 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Trevor Joseph Leyser - an active director whose contract began on 15 Oct 2002,
Jocelyn Elizabeth Leyser - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Oct 2002 and was terminated on 11 Apr 2017.
Updated on 20 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company uses, namely: 105 Mcarthur Road, Rd 1, Alexandra, 9391 (registered address),
105 Mcarthur Road, Rd 1, Alexandra, 9391 (service address),
22 Magnetic Place, Cromwell, Cromwell, 9310 (physical address).
Jelts Limited had been using 22 Magnetic Place, Cromwell, Cromwell as their registered address up until 21 Jul 2023.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Leyser, Trevor Joseph - located at 9391, Rd 1, Alexandra.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 22 Magnetic Place, Cromwell, Cromwell, 9310 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 02 Aug 2022 to 21 Jul 2023
Address #2: 144 Ripponvale Road, Rd 2, Cromwell, 9384 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 23 Jul 2019 to 02 Aug 2022
Address #3: Rd 2, Ripponvale, Cromwell, Central Otago New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 18 May 2006 to 23 Jul 2019
Address #4: Ripponvale, Ripponvale Road, Rd 2 Cromwell, Centra Otago 9191
Physical address used from 15 Oct 2002 to 18 May 2006
Address #5: C/- 30 Horace Street, Cromwell, Central Otago 9191
Registered address used from 15 Oct 2002 to 18 May 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 24 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Leyser, Trevor Joseph |
Rd 1 Alexandra 9391 New Zealand |
15 Oct 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Leyser, Jocelyn Elizabeth |
Ripponvale Cromwell, Central Otago New Zealand |
15 Oct 2002 - 11 Jul 2017 |
Trevor Joseph Leyser - Director
Appointment date: 15 Oct 2002
Address: Rd 1, Alexandra, 9391 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Jul 2023
Address: Cromwell, Cromwell, 9310 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Jul 2022
Address: Ripponvale, Cromwell, Central Otago, 9384 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Aug 2015
Jocelyn Elizabeth Leyser - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Oct 2002
Termination date: 11 Apr 2017
Address: Ripponvale, Cromwell, Central Otago, 9384 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Aug 2015
Central Concrete Placing Limited
118 Ord Road
Sales Results Limited
115 Ord Road