Triple F Co. Limited, a registered company, was registered on 21 Nov 2002. 9429036234981 is the number it was issued. "Business consultant service" (ANZSIC M696205) is how the company has been classified. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Katrina Margaret Ward - an active director whose contract started on 21 Nov 2002,
Michael Laurence Hayes - an active director whose contract started on 21 Nov 2002.
Updated on 31 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 9 Wairakei Street, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 (category: office, registered).
Triple F Co. Limited had been using Mgi Wilson Eliott Limited, Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket, Auckland as their registered address up until 09 Nov 2010.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group includes 98 shares (98%) held by 3 entities. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1%). Lastly we have the next share allotment (1 share 1%) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
9 Wairakei Street, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: Mgi Wilson Eliott Limited, Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Nov 2002 to 09 Nov 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 03 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Individual | Hayes, Michael Laurence |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
21 Nov 2002 - |
Individual | Ward, Katrina Margaret |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
21 Nov 2002 - |
Individual | Field, Joanne Marion |
Taradale Napier 4112 New Zealand |
17 Jan 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Ward, Katrina Margaret |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
21 Nov 2002 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Hayes, Michael Laurence |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
21 Nov 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Mgi Wilson Eliott Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038243424 Company Number: 825392 |
21 Nov 2002 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Mgi Wilson Eliott Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038243424 Company Number: 825392 |
21 Nov 2002 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Katrina Margaret Ward - Director
Appointment date: 21 Nov 2002
Address: Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Nov 2002
Michael Laurence Hayes - Director
Appointment date: 21 Nov 2002
Address: Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Nov 2002
Fa Yuan Charitable Trust
15 Wairakei Street
Sheng Yuan Buddhist Charitable Trust
15 Wairakei Street
Tsi Ming Temple Limited
17 Wairakei Street
The New Zealand Tsi Ming Charitable Trust Board
17 Wairakei St
Panther Cafe Limited
3/12 Wairakei Street
New Zealand Asia Pacific Culture & Arts Trust
4/12 Wairakei Street
A1crm Limited
32 Woodbine Avenue
Apexcellor (nz) Limited
259 Great South Road
Aro Advisers Limited
4 / 2 Woodbine Avenue/
Legion Limited
10 Newhaven Street
Tribeca Holdings Limited
5a Newhaven Street
Waterford Park Consulting Limited
2 Woodbine Avenue