Adepta Limited, a removed company, was launched on 04 Dec 2002. 9429036233953 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been managed by 1 director, named Richard Charles Wheatley - an active director whose contract began on 04 Dec 2002.
Last updated on 18 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company registered, namely: 7 Shoal Bay Road, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 (postal address),
7 Shoal Bay Road, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 (office address),
7 Shoal Bay Road, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 (delivery address),
Bhive Building, 74 Taharoto Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 (physical address) among others.
Adepta Limited had been using Level 2, 74 Taharoto Road, Takapuna, Auckland as their registered address until 23 Sep 2021.
Past names for this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 12 Aug 2005 to 01 Dec 2016 they were named Think Red Limited, from 04 Dec 2002 to 12 Aug 2005 they were named Red Design Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group includes 25 shares (2.5 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 25 shares (2.5 per cent). Lastly there is the third share allocation (950 shares 95 per cent) made up of 3 entities.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 7 Shoal Bay Road, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Postal & office & delivery address used from 24 Aug 2023
Principal place of activity
Floor 3, 87 Albert Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 2, 74 Taharoto Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Apr 2020 to 23 Sep 2021
Address #2: Level 6, 157 Symonds Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Sep 2016 to 29 Apr 2020
Address #3: Level 8, 120 Albert Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 May 2014 to 09 Sep 2016
Address #4: C/- Pkf Ross Melville, Level 3, 50 Anzac Avenue, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical address used from 08 May 2012 to 05 May 2014
Address #5: Level 5, 50 Anzac Avenue, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered address used from 25 May 2011 to 05 May 2014
Address #6: Level 5, 50 Anzac Avenue, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical address used from 25 May 2011 to 08 May 2012
Address #7: C/-ross Melville Pkf, Level 5, 50 Anzac Avenue, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 Jun 2005 to 25 May 2011
Address #8: Hayes Knight Ltd, Parnell House, 470 Parnell Road, Auckland 1
Physical & registered address used from 04 Dec 2002 to 02 Jun 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 13 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 25 | |||
Individual | Wheatley, Richard Charles |
Devonport Auckland New Zealand |
04 Dec 2002 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 25 | |||
Individual | Wheatley, Alissa Barbara |
Devonport Auckland New Zealand |
04 Dec 2002 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 950 | |||
Individual | Wheatley, Alissa Barbara |
Devonport Auckland New Zealand |
04 Dec 2002 - |
Individual | Collyer, John Andrew |
Devonport Auckland New Zealand |
26 May 2005 - |
Individual | Wheatley, Richard Charles |
Devonport Auckland New Zealand |
04 Dec 2002 - |
Richard Charles Wheatley - Director
Appointment date: 04 Dec 2002
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2003
J A Davey Limited
Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Road
Aquaknight Industries Limited
Level 7, 57 Symonds Street
Mr White Limited
Level 2, 60 Grafton Road
Mjic Limited
Level 2, 60 Grafton Road
Cj Cafe Limited
Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Rd
Country Treasures Limited
Level 2, 3 Arawa Street