Smiths Contracting Services Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 10 Mar 2003. 9429036106905 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Floor covering laying nec" (ANZSIC E324320) is how the company was categorised. This company has been supervised by 3 directors: Kirsten Smith - an active director whose contract started on 20 Sep 2008,
Frazer Andrew Smith - an active director whose contract started on 28 Apr 2018,
Christopher Ronald Smith - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Mar 2003 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2021.
Updated on 20 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 43A Irvine Street, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 (types include: registered, service).
Smiths Contracting Services Limited had been using 11A Myrtle Street, Hamilton East, Hamilton as their registered address until 22 Mar 2022.
Other names used by this company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 10 Mar 2003 to 20 Sep 2008 they were called Stair Smiths Limited.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Smith, Frazer Andrew - located at 3204, Orewa.
Principal place of activity
66 Goulstone Road, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 11a Myrtle Street, Hamilton East, Hamilton, 3216 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 Dec 2021 to 22 Mar 2022
Address #2: 11a Myrtle Street, Hamilton East, Hamilton, 3216 New Zealand
Physical address used from 12 Oct 2021 to 22 Dec 2021
Address #3: 8 Sheriff Place, Riverlea, Hamilton, 3216 New Zealand
Physical address used from 15 Apr 2021 to 12 Oct 2021
Address #4: 66 Goulstone Road, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Jun 2016 to 22 Dec 2021
Address #5: 66 Goulstone Road, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Physical address used from 01 Jun 2016 to 15 Apr 2021
Address #6: 1 Harbour Rd, Ohope, 3161 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Jun 2013 to 01 Jun 2016
Address #7: 17 Donald Street, Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa 0932 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 May 2010 to 26 Jun 2013
Address #8: 17 Donald St, Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa
Registered address used from 30 May 2006 to 06 May 2010
Address #9: 17 Donald Street, Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa
Physical address used from 30 May 2006 to 06 May 2010
Address #10: 1 Surf Road, Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa
Registered & physical address used from 30 May 2005 to 30 May 2006
Address #11: 140a Vipond Road, Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa
Registered & physical address used from 10 Mar 2003 to 30 May 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 13 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Smith, Frazer Andrew |
Orewa 0994 New Zealand |
10 May 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Smith, Kirsten |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2010 - 05 Apr 2021 |
Individual | Smith, Kirsten |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2010 - 05 Apr 2021 |
Individual | Smith, Christopher Ronald |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
10 Mar 2003 - 05 Apr 2021 |
Individual | Smith, Christopher Ronald |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
10 Mar 2003 - 05 Apr 2021 |
Kirsten Smith - Director
Appointment date: 20 Sep 2008
Address: Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Jul 2023
Address: Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Address used since 22 May 2022
Address: Riverlea, Hamilton, 3216 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2021
Address: Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2016
Frazer Andrew Smith - Director
Appointment date: 28 Apr 2018
Address: Orewa, 0994 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Apr 2018
Christopher Ronald Smith - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Mar 2003
Termination date: 31 Mar 2021
Address: Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2016
Seniornet Whakatane Incorporated
36-38 Goulstone Road
Arulambalam Holdings Limited
10 Soutars Avenue
Te Mauri O Te Manuka Tutahi Healers Trust
53 Goulstone Road
Kiwi Wairua Trust
73 Goulstone Road
Zhao Feng Limited
Shop 5, 84 Goulstone Road
Pragnesh & Kalpesh Enterprises Limited
68 King Street
Allfloor Limited
1574 State Highway 30
Bay Of Plenty Flooring Limited
54 Ashley Place
Coast Flooring Nz Limited
68 Dalton Drive
Floor Sure (bop) Limited
7a Moana Terrace
Papamoa Flooring Limited
1121 Papamoa Beach Road
Pro Woodfloors Limited
1/35 Enterprise Drive