Mmmm Co Limited, a registered company, was launched on 02 May 2003. 9429036002344 is the NZBN it was issued. "Educational support services nec" (ANZSIC P822020) is how the company is categorised. This company has been run by 3 directors: David Gordon Mcpherson - an active director whose contract started on 02 May 2003,
Mary Anne Mcpherson - an active director whose contract started on 02 May 2003,
Patricia Margaret Bright - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Jun 2015 and was terminated on 18 Sep 2017.
Updated on 07 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 13 Kowhai Road, Rainbow Point, Taupo, 3330 (types include: registered, physical).
Mmmm Co Limited had been using 8A Kaka Street, Taupo, Taupo as their physical address up to 20 Apr 2018.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: 8a Kaka Street, Taupo, Taupo, 3330 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Oct 2017 to 20 Apr 2018
Address: 3 Steele Road, Forest Lake, Hamilton, 3200 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 16 Jan 2013 to 04 Oct 2017
Address: C/- Guy Domett, The Business & Tax Centre, 42 Pembroke Street, Hamilton New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 May 2003 to 16 Jan 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 04 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Mcpherson, David Gordon |
Rainbow Point Taupo 3330 New Zealand |
08 Jan 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Mcpherson, Mary Anne |
Rainbow Point Taupo 3330 New Zealand |
08 Jan 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mcpherson, David Gordon |
Hamilton |
02 May 2003 - 08 Jan 2013 |
Individual | Hodgson, Mary Anne |
Hamilton |
02 May 2003 - 08 Jan 2013 |
David Gordon Mcpherson - Director
Appointment date: 02 May 2003
Address: Rainbow Point, Taupo, 3330 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Sep 2017
Address: Queenstown, Singapore, 140148 Singapore
Address used since 13 Jul 2013
Mary Anne Mcpherson - Director
Appointment date: 02 May 2003
Address: Rainbow Point, Taupo, 3330 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Dec 2018
Address: Rainbow Point, Taupo, 3330 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2018
Address: Queenstown, Singapore, 140148 Singapore
Address used since 13 Jul 2013
Patricia Margaret Bright - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Jun 2015
Termination date: 18 Sep 2017
Address: Forest Lake, Hamilton, 3200 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Jun 2015
Bevan Martin Electrical Limited
9 Charles Crescent
Forster Panelbeaters Limited
13 Aubrey Crescent
Venture Wanganui Limited
60 Rainbow Drive
Chiro Systems 2006 Limited
62 Rainbow Drive
Prices Bookshop 2008 Limited
34a Charles Crescent
Pauline Stockwell Design Limited
33 Pukenamu Road
Addi Consultancy Limited
11 Magnolia Rise
Ako Consulting Limited
2 Hindmarsh Drive
Direction Worx Limited
35 Arrowsmith Avenue
Nc. Wilkinsons Limited
5 D Springfield Road
Networthnz Limited
18 Pohutukawa Dr
Newzealand Marine Corps Limited
6 Dee Street