Lee & Blair Builders Limited was launched on 07 Jul 2003 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429035897804. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Tony Gerard Lee - an active director whose contract began on 07 Jul 2003,
Rayoni Maria Lee - an active director whose contract began on 12 Dec 2019,
Michael Edward Blair - an inactive director whose contract began on 07 Jul 2003 and was terminated on 16 Dec 2019.
As stated in BizDb's data (last updated on 31 Jul 2024), the company filed 1 address: an address for share register at 135 Gala Street, Queens Park, Invercargill, 9810 (category: other, shareregister).
A total of 100 shares are issued to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 90 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Lee, Rayoni Maria (an individual) located at Invercargill,
Lee, Tony Gerard (an individual) located at Invercargill.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 5% shares (exactly 5 shares) and includes
Lee, Rayoni Maria - located at Invercargill.
The 3rd share allotment (5 shares, 5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Lee, Tony Gerard, located at Invercargill (an individual).
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 18 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 90 | |||
Individual | Lee, Rayoni Maria |
Invercargill |
07 Jul 2003 - |
Individual | Lee, Tony Gerard |
Invercargill |
07 Jul 2003 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Individual | Lee, Rayoni Maria |
Invercargill |
07 Jul 2003 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Individual | Lee, Tony Gerard |
Invercargill |
07 Jul 2003 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Blair, Michael Edward |
Invercargill New Zealand |
07 Jul 2003 - 16 Dec 2019 |
Individual | Blair, Michael Edward |
Invercargill New Zealand |
07 Jul 2003 - 16 Dec 2019 |
Individual | Blair, Sharon Marie |
Invercargill New Zealand |
07 Jul 2003 - 16 Dec 2019 |
Tony Gerard Lee - Director
Appointment date: 07 Jul 2003
Address: Hawthorndale, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2010
Rayoni Maria Lee - Director
Appointment date: 12 Dec 2019
Address: Hawthorndale, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Dec 2019
Michael Edward Blair - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Jul 2003
Termination date: 16 Dec 2019
Address: Newfield, Invercargill, 9812 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Mar 2013
Fran Todd Insurance Limited
39 David Street
Polish Me Pretty Limited
53 Inglewood Road
Sky Castle Limited
10 West Street
Cass St Recycling Limited
35 Inglewood Road
Readymix Limited
35 Inglewood Road
Cromwell Bulk Distribution Limited
35 Inglewood Road