Croftpak Limited was registered on 21 Jul 2003 and issued a number of 9429035871156. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Gregory James Croft - an active director whose contract started on 21 Jul 2003,
Joanne Arlene Carter - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Jul 2003 and was terminated on 09 Jun 2022.
According to BizDb's database (updated on 28 Jul 2024), this company uses 1 address: 34, Birmingham Drive, Christchurch, 8024 (types include: registered, physical).
Up to 09 Nov 2020, Croftpak Limited had been using Level 1 34 Birmingham Drive, Christchurch as their registered address.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 900 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Croft, Gregory James (an individual) located at Governors Bay, Canterbury.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 10% shares (exactly 100 shares) and includes
Carter, Joanne Arlene - located at Governors Bay, Canterbury.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1 34 Birmingham Drive, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 Feb 2016 to 09 Nov 2020
Address: Level 1 40 Durham Street South, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 05 Dec 2011 to 22 Feb 2016
Address: C/- Bevan G Smith, Level 1 291 Madras St, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 21 Jul 2003 to 05 Dec 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 15 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 900 | |||
Individual | Croft, Gregory James |
Governors Bay Canterbury |
21 Jul 2003 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Carter, Joanne Arlene |
Governors Bay Canterbury |
21 Jul 2003 - |
Gregory James Croft - Director
Appointment date: 21 Jul 2003
Address: Governors Bay, Canterbury, 8971 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Feb 2016
Joanne Arlene Carter - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Jul 2003
Termination date: 09 Jun 2022
Address: Governors Bay, Canterbury, 8971 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Feb 2016
Black Kettle Holdings Limited
Level 1, 205 Durham Street South
Deg Tegh Fateh Sikh Society Incorporated
48 Burlington Street
Travel & Study On Demand Limited
91b Hastings Street West
Logan Signs Limited
3 Austin Street
Great Leap Forward Aotearoa
43 Burlington Street
Wks Karting Supplies Limited
359 Brougham Street