Culinary Concepts Limited, a registered company, was launched on 29 Jul 2003. 9429035852568 is the number it was issued. The company has been managed by 2 directors: John Roger Gavin Marquet - an active director whose contract began on 29 Jul 2003,
Claire Eileen Marquet - an inactive director whose contract began on 29 Jul 2003 and was terminated on 04 Jun 2020.
Updated on 26 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, 1 Papanui Road,, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 (type: registered, service).
Culinary Concepts Limited had been using 4 Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch as their physical address up until 03 Jun 2022.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Marquet, John Roger Gavin - located at 8014, Cracroft, Christchurch.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 4 Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 07 Mar 2008 to 03 Jun 2022
Address #2: Rae Hardie & Associates Limited, 4 Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 28 May 2007 to 07 Mar 2008
Address #3: Taurus Accounting Solutions Ltd, Level 3, Landsborough House, 287 Durham Street, Christchurch
Physical & registered address used from 29 Jul 2003 to 28 May 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 15 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Marquet, John Roger Gavin |
Cracroft Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
29 Jul 2003 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Marquet, Claire Eileen |
Westmorland Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
29 Jul 2003 - 11 Jun 2020 |
John Roger Gavin Marquet - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jul 2003
Address: Cracroft, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Apr 2022
Address: Beckenham, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Apr 2021
Address: Woolston, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Apr 2014
Address: Cracroft, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Apr 2018
Claire Eileen Marquet - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jul 2003
Termination date: 04 Jun 2020
Address: Westmorland, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Apr 2014
Chreos Limited
4 Leslie Hills Drive
Wild Software Limited
4 Leslie Hills Drive
Big Brand Outlet Limited
4 Leslie Hills Drive
Dr Paula Hanley Limited
1st Floor, 10 Leslie Hills Drive
Wwl Trustees Services 106 Limited
1st Floor, 10 Leslie Hills Drive
Mornington Investments Limited
1st Floor, 10 Leslie Hills Drive