Shoppers Anon Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 13 Nov 2003. 9429035670681 is the NZBN it was issued. This company has been managed by 6 directors: Jyoti Bhasin - an active director whose contract began on 01 Dec 2022,
Ross Cohen - an active director whose contract began on 01 Dec 2022,
Michael W. - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Feb 2020 and was terminated on 15 Dec 2022,
Nigel John Burrows - an inactive director whose contract began on 13 Nov 2003 and was terminated on 01 Dec 2022,
Peter Mark Bracher - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Jan 2016 and was terminated on 25 Feb 2020.
Updated on 08 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, Australis Nathan Building, 37 Galway Street, Takutai Square, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, service).
Shoppers Anon Limited had been using Level 1 Cpo Building, 12 Queen Street, Britomart, Auckland as their physical address up until 29 May 2017.
Former names used by this company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 13 Nov 2003 to 08 Aug 2013 they were called Gob Limited.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Nsf International Food Safety, Llc - located at 1010, Ann Arbor, Michigan.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1 Cpo Building, 12 Queen Street, Britomart, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 16 Feb 2016 to 29 May 2017
Address: 1/49 Rawene Rd, Birkenhead New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Jul 2005 to 16 Feb 2016
Address: 17 Jacaranda Avenue, Mariners Cove, Birkenhead, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 13 Nov 2003 to 01 Jul 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 17 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Other (Other) | Nsf International Food Safety, Llc |
Ann Arbor Michigan 48105 United States |
15 Jan 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Burrows, Tracey Lee Maria |
Birkenhead North Shore City 0626 New Zealand |
13 Nov 2003 - 15 Jan 2016 |
Individual | Burrows, Nigel John |
Birkenhead North Shore City 0626 New Zealand |
13 Nov 2003 - 15 Jan 2016 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Jyoti Bhasin - Director
Appointment date: 01 Dec 2022
Address: Dlf Phase-2, Gurgaon, Haryana, 122002 India
Address used since 01 Dec 2022
Ross Cohen - Director
Appointment date: 01 Dec 2022
Address: Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2022
Michael W. - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Feb 2020
Termination date: 15 Dec 2022
Nigel John Burrows - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Nov 2003
Termination date: 01 Dec 2022
Address: Birkenhead, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 11 May 2016
Peter Mark Bracher - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Jan 2016
Termination date: 25 Feb 2020
Address: 25 Soi Chidlom, Lumpini, Bangkok, 10330 Thailand
Address used since 15 Jan 2016
Tracey Lee Maria Burrows - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Nov 2003
Termination date: 15 Jan 2016
Address: Birkenhead, , Auckland, New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2005
Loki Limited
53 Rawene Road
Birkenhead Point Property Limited
1/45 Rawene Road
Aslin Graphics Limited
30 Rawene Road
Caution Group Limited
3 Mollyhawk Place
Stanley Enterprises Limited
4 Mollyhawk Place
Segno Safety (nz) Limited
39 Rawene Road