Olive Scope Limited was registered on 05 Dec 2003 and issued an NZBN of 9429035647232. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Lisa Balle - an active director whose contract started on 05 Dec 2003,
Lisa Dearing - an active director whose contract started on 05 Dec 2003,
Christopher Terrence Balle - an active director whose contract started on 05 Dec 2003.
As stated in BizDb's information (updated on 31 Jul 2024), this company uses 1 address: 109 Main Road, R D 1, Bombay 2675, 2675 (type: physical, registered).
Up to 03 May 2012, Olive Scope Limited had been using 109 Main Road, R D, Bombay 1850 as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (6 shareholders in total). In the first group, 50 shares are held by 3 entities, namely:
Balle, Dacey Vincent (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050,
Balle, Brendan Rory Gerard (an individual) located at Pukekohe,
Balle, Christopher Terrence (an individual) located at R D, Bombay 1850.
The second group consists of 3 shareholders, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Balle, Lisa - located at R D 1, Bombay,
Jamieson, Delene - located at Pukekohe,
Balle, Christopher Terrence - located at R D, Bombay 1850.
Previous addresses
Address: 109 Main Road, R D, Bombay 1850 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 May 2005 to 03 May 2012
Address: Hunter Withers, Chartered Accountants, 3 Harris Street, Pukekohe
Registered & physical address used from 05 Dec 2003 to 06 May 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 09 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Balle, Dacey Vincent |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
30 Apr 2024 - |
Individual | Balle, Brendan Rory Gerard |
Pukekohe |
05 Dec 2003 - |
Individual | Balle, Christopher Terrence |
R D Bombay 1850 New Zealand |
05 Dec 2003 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Balle, Lisa |
R D 1 Bombay 2675 New Zealand |
23 May 2018 - |
Individual | Jamieson, Delene |
Pukekohe |
05 Dec 2003 - |
Individual | Balle, Christopher Terrence |
R D Bombay 1850 New Zealand |
05 Dec 2003 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Dearing, Lisa |
R D Bombay 1850 New Zealand |
05 Dec 2003 - 23 May 2018 |
Lisa Balle - Director
Appointment date: 05 Dec 2003
Address: R D 1, Bombay, 2675 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Apr 2012
Lisa Dearing - Director
Appointment date: 05 Dec 2003
Address: R D 1, Bombay, 2675 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Apr 2012
Christopher Terrence Balle - Director
Appointment date: 05 Dec 2003
Address: R D 1, Bombay, 2675 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Apr 2012
Universal Tyres Limited
72 Lowry Road
The Shearing Shed Limited
87 Lowry Road
Gr Produce Limited
221 Paparata Road
Connected Minds Limited
129 Paparata Road
Living Culture Limited
161 Lowry Road
Lowfield Herefords Limited
161 Lowry Road