Shiloh Plains Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 15 Dec 2003. 9429035618188 is the number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 3 directors: Selwyn Robert Cleland - an active director whose contract began on 29 Sep 2021,
Robert Cleland - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Dec 2003 and was terminated on 10 Dec 2021,
Elizabeth Cleland - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Dec 2003 and was terminated on 10 Dec 2021.
Updated on 17 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, 3119 (type: registered, physical).
Shiloh Plains Limited had been using 123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke as their physical address until 07 Dec 2021.
All company shares (1000 shares exactly) are owned by a single group consisting of 2 entities, namely:
Cleland, Hannah Nicole (an individual) located at R D 1, Whakatane postcode 3191,
Cleland, Selwyn Robert (a director) located at Rd 1, Whakatane postcode 3191.
Previous addresses
Address: 123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, 3119 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 18 Nov 2009 to 07 Dec 2021
Address: The Business Results Group Limited, 123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke
Physical & registered address used from 15 Dec 2003 to 18 Nov 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 23 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Cleland, Hannah Nicole |
R D 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
12 Jan 2022 - |
Director | Cleland, Selwyn Robert |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
12 Jan 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Cleland, Robert Leslie |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
12 Jan 2022 - 12 Jan 2022 |
Entity | Brg Trustees 2014 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041106648 Company Number: 4984740 |
Te Puke Te Puke 3119 New Zealand |
26 Jun 2015 - 12 Jan 2022 |
Individual | Cleland, Robert |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2003 - 16 Dec 2021 |
Individual | Cleland, Elizabeth |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2003 - 16 Dec 2021 |
Individual | Cleland, Selwyn And Hannah |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
12 Jan 2022 - 12 Jan 2022 |
Entity | Brg Trustees 2014 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041106648 Company Number: 4984740 |
12 Jan 2022 - 12 Jan 2022 | |
Individual | Cleland, Robert |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2003 - 16 Dec 2021 |
Individual | Cleland, Robert |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2003 - 16 Dec 2021 |
Individual | Cleland, Elizabeth Mary |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
12 Jan 2022 - 12 Jan 2022 |
Entity | Brg Trustees 2014 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041106648 Company Number: 4984740 |
12 Jan 2022 - 12 Jan 2022 | |
Entity | Brg Trustees 2014 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041106648 Company Number: 4984740 |
Te Puke Te Puke 3119 New Zealand |
26 Jun 2015 - 12 Jan 2022 |
Individual | Cleland, Elizabeth |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2003 - 16 Dec 2021 |
Individual | Cleland, Elizabeth |
Rd 1 Whakatane 3191 New Zealand |
15 Dec 2003 - 16 Dec 2021 |
Selwyn Robert Cleland - Director
Appointment date: 29 Sep 2021
Address: Rd 1, Whakatane, 3191 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Sep 2021
Robert Cleland - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Dec 2003
Termination date: 10 Dec 2021
Address: Rd 1, Whakatane, 3191 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Nov 2015
Elizabeth Cleland - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Dec 2003
Termination date: 10 Dec 2021
Address: Rd 1, Whakatane, 3191 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Nov 2015
Cocksy Five Limited
123 Jellicoe Street
Dng Farming Limited
123 Jellicoe Street
Semloh Contracting Limited
123 Jellicoe Street
Harrmac Farms Limited
123 Jellicoe Street
Zephyr Mk Iv Limited
123 Jellicoe Street
G M Cawte Limited
123 Jellicoe Street