Jayanden Investments Limited, a registered company, was registered on 14 Apr 2004. 9429035450115 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Rental of residential property" (ANZSIC L671160) is how the company was categorised. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Jan Maree Cummings - an active director whose contract began on 14 Apr 2004,
Norman Donald Cummings - an active director whose contract began on 14 Apr 2004.
Updated on 02 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 48 Judkins Crescent, Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 (category: postal, office).
Jayanden Investments Limited had been using Unit 5, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland as their physical address until 01 May 2018.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Principal place of activity
48 Judkins Crescent, Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Unit 5, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Apr 2018 to 01 May 2018
Address #2: 48 Judkins Crescent, Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 27 Mar 2018 to 04 Apr 2018
Address #3: 27c William Pickering Drive, Albany, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 Mar 2006 to 27 Mar 2018
Address #4: C/- Middleton Holland & Assoc. Ltd, Level 1/20 Link Drive, Wairau Park, North Shore City
Physical & registered address used from 14 Apr 2004 to 23 Mar 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 05 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Cummings, Norman Donald |
Howick Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
14 Apr 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Cummings, Jan Maree |
Howick Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
14 Apr 2004 - |
Jan Maree Cummings - Director
Appointment date: 14 Apr 2004
Address: Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2011
Norman Donald Cummings - Director
Appointment date: 14 Apr 2004
Address: Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2011
Tech People National Limited
50 Judkins Crescent
Nz Warranties Limited
50 Judkins Crescent
Black Marlin Business Services Limited
50 Judkins Crescent
Black Marlin Investments Limited
50 Judkins Crescent
Balancing Rock Limited
35 Judkins Crescent
Referboman Limited
35 Judkins Crescent
Adriana Rentals Limited
13 Judkins Crescent
Asa Group Limited
47a Churchill Road
Furry Dwellings Limited
54 Advene Road
K House Development Limited
48 Churchill Road
P & T Dwyer Limited
54 Judkins Crescent
Pandora Trustee Services Limited
65 Churchill Road