Te Kaihau Limited was launched on 14 Apr 2004 and issued a business number of 9429035440659. The registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Deborah Kennedy Gilbertson - an active director whose contract started on 14 Apr 2004,
David William Gilbertson - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Apr 2008 and was terminated on 18 Dec 2020,
Suzanne Dorothy Fitzmaurice - an inactive director whose contract started on 14 Apr 2004 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2008.
According to BizDb's information (last updated on 21 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 117 Stratton Street, Normandale, Lower Hutt, 5010 (type: postal, delivery).
Up until 23 Feb 2010, Te Kaihau Limited had been using 117 Stratton St, Normandale, Lower Hutt as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Gilbertson, Deborah Kennedy (an individual) located at Normandale, Lower Hutt postcode 5010.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Gilbertson, David William - located at Normandale, Lower Hutt. Te Kaihau Limited has been classified as "Adult, community, and other education nec" (business classification P821905).
Principal place of activity
117 Stratton Street, Normandale, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 117 Stratton St, Normandale, Lower Hutt
Physical & registered address used from 14 Apr 2004 to 23 Feb 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 09 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Gilbertson, Deborah Kennedy |
Normandale Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
17 Feb 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Gilbertson, David William |
Normandale Lower Hutt 5010 New Zealand |
17 Feb 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Gilbertson, Deborah Kennedy |
Normandale Lower Hutt |
14 Apr 2004 - 17 Feb 2009 |
Individual | Fitzmaurice, Suzanne Dorothy |
Eastbourne Lower Hutt |
14 Apr 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Deborah Kennedy Gilbertson - Director
Appointment date: 14 Apr 2004
Address: Normandale, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Apr 2004
David William Gilbertson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2008
Termination date: 18 Dec 2020
Address: Normandale, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2008
Suzanne Dorothy Fitzmaurice - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Apr 2004
Termination date: 01 Apr 2008
Address: Eastbourne, Lower Hutt,
Address used since 14 Apr 2004
Te Kaihau Education Trust
117 Stratton Street
Jumbletree Limited
147 Stratton Street
Gsn Associates Limited
102 Stratton Street
Rombel & Miller Limited
49 Cottle Park Drive
Wookiee Limited
38 Cottle Park Drive
Wize Contractors Limited
65 Cottle Park Drive
Aqua Experience Limited
454 Takapu Road
Glensorbest Consulting Limited
1a Te Whiti Grove
Hei Tauira Limited
31 Rakeiora Grove
Knowledge Ambience Limited
10 Boronia Grove
Lapel Limited
7 Beaumont Avenue
School Of Business Limited
29 Kings Crescent