Bee Management Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 23 Jun 2004. 9429035333012 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been run by 6 directors: Grant Withers - an active director whose contract began on 16 Jul 2007,
Ross Withers - an active director whose contract began on 26 Nov 2007,
Simon Matthews - an active director whose contract began on 27 Mar 2009,
Simon Small - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 Jul 2007 and was terminated on 26 Nov 2007,
Duncan James Mcewan - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Jun 2004 and was terminated on 28 Jul 2007.
Updated on 15 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 451 Ilam Road, Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052 (types include: registered, physical).
Bee Management Limited had been using 64A Rotouna Road, Hamilton as their physical address up to 25 May 2015.
Other names used by the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 27 Sep 2006 to 15 Jan 2018 they were called The Clean Car Cleaning Centre (Canterbury) Limited, from 23 Jun 2004 to 27 Sep 2006 they were called The Clean Car Cleaning Centre (Queenstown) Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 10 shareholders (5 groups). The first group is comprised of 1 share (0.1%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 2 shareholders in control of 460 shares (46%). Finally the 3rd share allocation (458 shares 45.8%) made up of 3 entities.
Previous addresses
Address: 64a Rotouna Road, Hamilton, 2010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Jun 2013 to 25 May 2015
Address: 65 Peary Road, Mt Eden, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 Jul 2007 to 04 Jun 2013
Address: 44 York Place, Dunedin
Registered & physical address used from 23 Jun 2004 to 23 Jul 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 13 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Withers, Ross |
Hamilton 2010 New Zealand |
10 Dec 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 460 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Swl Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036643059 |
Ponsonby Auckland 1021 |
06 Aug 2007 - |
Individual | Withers, Grant |
Bryndwr Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
06 Aug 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 458 | |||
Individual | Casey, Philippa |
Hamilton 2010 New Zealand |
10 Dec 2007 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Clm Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036208098 |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
10 Dec 2007 - |
Individual | Withers, Ross |
Hamilton 2010 New Zealand |
10 Dec 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 80 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Sardinero Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035381389 |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 New Zealand |
31 Mar 2009 - |
Individual | Matthews, Simon |
Cashmere Christchurch New Zealand |
31 Mar 2009 - |
Individual | Carlsen, Charlotte |
Cashmere Christchurch New Zealand |
31 Mar 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Casey, Philippa |
Hamilton 2010 New Zealand |
10 Dec 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | The Clean Car Cleaning Centre (nz) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035733737 Company Number: 1415084 |
23 Jun 2004 - 04 Aug 2007 | |
Individual | Withers, Grant |
Hamilton |
04 Aug 2007 - 04 Aug 2007 |
Entity | The Clean Car Cleaning Centre (nz) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035733737 Company Number: 1415084 |
23 Jun 2004 - 04 Aug 2007 | |
Individual | Webb, Debra |
Rd9 Otatara, Invercargill |
04 Aug 2007 - 06 Aug 2007 |
Individual | Small, Simon |
Rd9 Otatara, Invercargill |
04 Aug 2007 - 06 Aug 2007 |
Grant Withers - Director
Appointment date: 16 Jul 2007
Address: Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 25 May 2015
Ross Withers - Director
Appointment date: 26 Nov 2007
Address: Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 05 May 2016
Simon Matthews - Director
Appointment date: 27 Mar 2009
Address: Hoon Hay, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2011
Address: Westmorland, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jan 2018
Simon Small - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Jul 2007
Termination date: 26 Nov 2007
Address: Rd9, Otatara, Invercargill,
Address used since 16 Jul 2007
Duncan James Mcewan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jun 2004
Termination date: 28 Jul 2007
Address: Dunedin,
Address used since 27 Sep 2006
George Pattrick Cummings - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jun 2004
Termination date: 23 Feb 2006
Address: Company Bay, Dunedin,
Address used since 23 Jun 2004
Doplor Limited
459a Ilam Road
Charteris Trust Company Limited
443b Ilam Road
Willowview Holdings Limited
469a Ilam Road
Paul Mcstay Limited
469a Ilam Road
Ga Consultancy Limited
2 Rhyl Place
Meadowstone Holdings Limited
2 Rhyl Place