Wild Olive Investments Limited was launched on 20 Jul 2004 and issued a number of 9429035303244. The registered LTD company has been run by 4 directors: Zaharo Marika Topp - an active director whose contract began on 02 Dec 2019,
Zaharo Topp - an active director whose contract began on 02 Dec 2019,
Tilly Anna Augoustides - an inactive director whose contract began on 20 Jul 2004 and was terminated on 02 Dec 2019,
Zaharo Marika Topp - an inactive director whose contract began on 20 Jul 2004 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2015.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 10 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 18A Victoria Road, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 (type: registered, physical).
Up to 24 Aug 2017, Wild Olive Investments Limited had been using 28A Summit Drive, Torbay, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 900 shares are allocated to 4 groups (10 shareholders in total). In the first group, 225 shares are held by 3 entities, namely:
Topp, Zaharo Marika (an individual) located at Devonport, Auckland postcode 0624,
Landman, Willem Johannes (an individual) located at Meadowbank, Auckland postcode 1072,
Topp, Warren (an individual) located at Devonport, Auckland postcode 0624.
Then there is a group that consists of 3 shareholders, holds 25% shares (exactly 225 shares) and includes
Augoustides, Michael Andronikos - located at Rosedale, Auckland,
Augoustides, Cornelis Andronikos - located at Rosedale, Auckland,
Topp, Zaharo Marika - located at Devonport, Auckland.
The third share allocation (225 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Augoustides, Tilly Anna, located at Devonport, Auckland (an individual).
Previous addresses
Address: 28a Summit Drive, Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Mar 2015 to 24 Aug 2017
Address: 11 Allenby Ave, Devonport New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Jul 2004 to 11 Mar 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 900
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 07 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 225 | |||
Individual | Topp, Zaharo Marika |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - |
Individual | Landman, Willem Johannes |
Meadowbank Auckland 1072 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - |
Individual | Topp, Warren |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
02 Dec 2019 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 225 | |||
Individual | Augoustides, Michael Andronikos |
Rosedale Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - |
Individual | Augoustides, Cornelis Andronikos |
Rosedale Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - |
Individual | Topp, Zaharo Marika |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 225 | |||
Individual | Augoustides, Tilly Anna |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 225 | |||
Individual | Landman, Willem Johannes |
Meadowbank Auckland 1072 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - |
Individual | Augoustides, Cornelis Andronikos |
Rosedale Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - |
Individual | Augoustides, Michael Andronikos |
Rosedale Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Other | Codymo Trustees Limited | 20 Jul 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Individual | Augoustides, Alexandros Andronicos |
Devonport |
20 Jul 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Topp, Warren Kent |
Devonport North Shore City New Zealand |
31 Aug 2007 - 30 Jan 2014 |
Other | Null - Codymo Trustees Limited | 20 Jul 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Individual | Topp, Zaharo Marika |
Devonport |
20 Jul 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Zaharo Marika Topp - Director
Appointment date: 02 Dec 2019
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Mar 2024
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Dec 2019
Zaharo Topp - Director
Appointment date: 02 Dec 2019
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Dec 2019
Tilly Anna Augoustides - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Jul 2004
Termination date: 02 Dec 2019
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Mar 2016
Zaharo Marika Topp - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Jul 2004
Termination date: 31 Mar 2015
Address: Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Mar 2015
Anw Company Limited
71 Victoria Road
Stanley Bay Trustees Limited
4/26 Victoria Road
Bespoke Nz Design Limited
4/26 Victoria Road
B.y.j. Company Limited
26 Victoria Road
Bitola Restaurant Limited
5/26victoria Road
Dykman & Dykman Landscaping Limited
Suite 4, 26 Victoria Road