Bay Reliability Solutions Limited was registered on 02 Aug 2004 and issued an NZ business number of 9429035250913. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 1 director, named Rudy Nico Boonen - an active director whose contract began on 02 Aug 2004.
As stated in our database (last updated on 27 Aug 2024), the company uses 4 addresses: 10 Domain Road, Whakatāne, 3120 (registered address),
10 Domain Road, Whakatāne, 3120 (service address),
4 Elliot Way, Rd 6, Tauranga, 3176 (registered address),
4 Elliot Way, Rd 6, Tauranga, 3176 (physical address) among others.
Until 05 Mar 2021, Bay Reliability Solutions Limited had been using 60 Durham Street, Tauranga as their registered address.
BizDb found other names used by the company: from 02 Aug 2004 to 13 Sep 2012 they were named Venture Engineering Limited.
A total of 200 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Boonen, Julie (an individual) located at Whakatane, Whakatane postcode 3120.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 100 shares) and includes
Boonen, Rudy Nico - located at Whakatane, Whakatane.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 10 Domain Road, Whakatāne, 3120 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 30 May 2024
Previous addresses
Address #1: 60 Durham Street, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Jan 2021 to 05 Mar 2021
Address #2: 7 Totara Street, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 30 Mar 2007 to 19 Jan 2021
Address #3: 1 College Road, Shop 3, Edgecumbe
Registered & physical address used from 10 Nov 2006 to 30 Mar 2007
Address #4: 501 Grieve Road, Whakatane
Physical & registered address used from 02 Aug 2004 to 10 Nov 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 200
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 03 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Boonen, Julie |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
14 Dec 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Boonen, Rudy Nico |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Leman, Julie |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2004 - 14 Dec 2017 |
Rudy Nico Boonen - Director
Appointment date: 02 Aug 2004
Address: Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Dec 2014
Waimanalo Limited
7 Totara Street
Bj & Kl Properties Limited
7 Totara Street
Gokidgo Limited
7 Totara Street
J B Lloyd Chartered Accountants Limited
7 Totara Street
Waikato Vehicle Leasing Limited
7 Totara Street
Burgess Construction Limited
7 Totara Street