Kitchen Plus New Zealand Limited, a registered company, was launched on 18 Aug 2004. 9429035227328 is the business number it was issued. "Cabinet making, joinery - furniture" (ANZSIC C251130) is how the company is classified. The company has been supervised by 6 directors: Sik Wing Hung - an active director whose contract started on 05 Apr 2021,
Jianyue Chen - an inactive director whose contract started on 25 May 2020 and was terminated on 16 Jun 2022,
Sik Wing Hung - an inactive director whose contract started on 08 May 2020 and was terminated on 27 May 2020,
Jianyue Chen - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 Feb 2010 and was terminated on 11 May 2020,
Jianyue Chen - an inactive director whose contract started on 18 Aug 2004 and was terminated on 22 Apr 2010.
Updated on 26 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 5 Copsey Place, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 (category: postal, postal).
Kitchen Plus New Zealand Limited had been using 8 Monier Place, Mount Wellington, Auckland as their physical address until 21 Jun 2019.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 50 shares) - Hung, Sik Wing - located at 1026, Avondale, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
8 Monier Place, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 8 Monier Place, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 Dec 2015 to 21 Jun 2019
Address #2: 73b Felton Mathew Ave, St Johns, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 19 Feb 2010 to 22 Dec 2015
Address #3: Unit D, No 6, Morrin Road, Panmure, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 25 Feb 2005 to 19 Feb 2010
Address #4: 166c Marua Road, Ellerslie, Auckland, New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Aug 2004 to 25 Feb 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 28 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Hung, Sik Wing |
Avondale Auckland 1026 New Zealand |
12 Apr 2021 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Chen, Jianyue |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
26 May 2020 - 18 Jun 2022 |
Individual | Hung, Sik Wing |
Avondale Auckland 1026 New Zealand |
09 May 2020 - 26 May 2020 |
Individual | Wang, Lily Yali |
Amberwood Drive Howick, Auckland |
30 Apr 2006 - 30 Apr 2006 |
Individual | Chen, Jianyue |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
26 May 2020 - 18 Jun 2022 |
Individual | Bai, Haiping |
East Tamaki Auckland, New Zealand |
18 Aug 2004 - 19 Feb 2006 |
Individual | Chen, Jianyue |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2004 - 09 May 2020 |
Sik Wing Hung - Director
Appointment date: 05 Apr 2021
Address: Avondale, Auckland, 1026 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Apr 2021
Jianyue Chen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 May 2020
Termination date: 16 Jun 2022
Address: Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Address used since 25 May 2020
Sik Wing Hung - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 May 2020
Termination date: 27 May 2020
Address: Avondale, Auckland, 1026 New Zealand
Address used since 08 May 2020
Jianyue Chen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Feb 2010
Termination date: 11 May 2020
Address: Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2012
Jianyue Chen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Aug 2004
Termination date: 22 Apr 2010
Address: Panmure, Auckland, New Zealand,
Address used since 01 Jun 2007
Haiping Bai - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Aug 2004
Termination date: 28 Mar 2006
Address: East Tamaki, Auckland, New Zealand,
Address used since 18 Aug 2004
Kiwi Empire Confectionery Limited
72 Leonard Road
Ahead Buildings Limited
54-58 Leonard Road
Ahead Hire Limited
54-58 Leonard Road
Access One Hire Limited
54-58 Leonard Road
Access One Scaffolding Limited
54-58 Leonard Road
Sung Gi Enterprise Limited
6a Monier Place
554 South Limited
642 Great South Road
Bespoke Cabinetry Limited
Unit 6, 90 Elizabeth Knox Place
Best Kitchens Limited
940 Great South Road
Design Tactix Limited
42 Searle Street
Meridian Joinery Limited
Level 1, Building C
Philbe Design Limited
94 Paihia Road