Generator Shop Limited, a registered company, was started on 29 Sep 2004. 9429035214304 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Construction machinery or equipment wholesaling" (ANZSIC F341120) is how the company is classified. The company has been supervised by 4 directors: Alastair William Oliver Chapman - an active director whose contract began on 29 Sep 2004,
Ben Erlton Robert Wilson - an inactive director whose contract began on 29 Sep 2004 and was terminated on 07 May 2010,
Robert Erlton Orbell Wilson - an inactive director whose contract began on 29 Sep 2004 and was terminated on 07 May 2010,
Daqun Hu - an inactive director whose contract began on 04 Aug 2006 and was terminated on 07 May 2010.
Updated on 14 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: Po Box 201027, Auckland Airport, Auckland, 2150 (types include: postal, office).
Generator Shop Limited had been using Offices Of Accountancy At Altitude Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 21A Brownstown Street, Wanaka as their registered address until 28 Mar 2014.
Old names used by the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 29 Sep 2004 to 03 Aug 2018 they were named Kipor Generators (Nz) Limited.
A total of 300 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 10 shares (3.33 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 2 shareholders in control of 290 shares (96.67 per cent).
Principal place of activity
3/17 Airpark Drive, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Offices Of Accountancy At Altitude Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 21a Brownstown Street, Wanaka New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Jul 2006 to 28 Mar 2014
Address #2: 3 Helwick Street, Wanaka
Physical & registered address used from 29 Sep 2004 to 19 Jul 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 300
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 03 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Chapman, Alastair William Oliver |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
29 Sep 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 290 | |||
Individual | Chapman, Alastair William Oliver |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
29 Sep 2004 - |
Individual | Mcdougall, Russell |
Glenross Dunedin 9011 New Zealand |
29 Sep 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Overton, Richard Leigh |
Wanaka |
29 Sep 2004 - 05 Mar 2009 |
Individual | Wilson, Robert Erlton Orbell |
Wanaka |
29 Sep 2004 - 05 Mar 2009 |
Entity | Auskin Nz Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038504471 Company Number: 670690 |
01 Sep 2006 - 05 Mar 2009 | |
Individual | Wilson, Prudence Helen |
Wanaka |
29 Sep 2004 - 05 Mar 2009 |
Entity | Auskin Nz Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038504471 Company Number: 670690 |
01 Sep 2006 - 05 Mar 2009 |
Alastair William Oliver Chapman - Director
Appointment date: 29 Sep 2004
Address: Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Dec 2014
Ben Erlton Robert Wilson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Sep 2004
Termination date: 07 May 2010
Address: Wanaka, 9305 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Sep 2004
Robert Erlton Orbell Wilson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Sep 2004
Termination date: 07 May 2010
Address: Wanaka, 9305 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2009
Daqun Hu - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Aug 2006
Termination date: 07 May 2010
Address: Broadbeach Waters, Queensland 4218, Australia,
Address used since 04 Aug 2006
Global Machine Tools Limited
Unit 9, 17 Airpark Drive
New Zealand Fish Processing Limited
Unit 8, 17 Airpark Drive
Accessable Limited
9 Airpark Drive
Environmental Health Management Services Limited
9 Airpark Drive
Ehms Properties Limited
9 Airpark Drive
Ehms Properties Auckland Limited
9 Airpark Drive
Asset Force Limited
53 Church Street
Endraulic Limited
47 Rennie Drive
G M Hydraulics And Industrial Services Limited
61 Tiraumea Drive
Meridian Aquatic Technology Australasia Limited
7 Fisher Crescent
Mian Trading Limited
615 Great South Road
Specialised Glass Engineering Limited
Unit B4, 269a Mt Smart Rd