Leven Investments Limited was started on 05 Oct 2004 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429035194910. This registered LTD company has been managed by 4 directors: Andree Dawn Cunningham - an active director whose contract started on 05 Oct 2004,
Alex Russell Cunningham - an active director whose contract started on 27 Oct 2016,
Kate Louise Tiriaere - an active director whose contract started on 27 Oct 2016,
Russell John Cunningham - an inactive director whose contract started on 05 Oct 2004 and was terminated on 23 Aug 2013.
According to our data (updated on 02 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: 173 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 (category: physical, registered).
Up until 22 Nov 2019, Leven Investments Limited had been using 173 Spey Street, Invercargill as their physical address.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 2 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Cunningham, Andree Dawn (an individual) located at Windsor, Invercargill postcode 9810.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 99.8% shares (exactly 998 shares) and includes
R & A Cunningham Trustees Limited - located at Invercargill.
Previous addresses
Address: 173 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 27 Nov 2013 to 22 Nov 2019
Address: Whk South, 173 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 25 Mar 2011 to 27 Nov 2013
Address: Whk South, 62 Deveron Street, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 29 Nov 2010 to 25 Mar 2011
Address: Whk, 62 Deveron Street, Invercargill 9810 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Dec 2009 to 29 Nov 2010
Address: Whk Cook Adam Ward Wilson, 62 Deveron Street, Invercargill
Physical & registered address used from 27 Nov 2007 to 04 Dec 2009
Address: Whk Cook Adam, 181 Spey Street, Invercargill
Physical & registered address used from 31 Oct 2006 to 27 Nov 2007
Address: 181 Spey Street, Invercargill
Registered & physical address used from 05 Oct 2004 to 31 Oct 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 12 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Individual | Cunningham, Andree Dawn |
Windsor Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
05 Oct 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 998 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | R & A Cunningham Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030614536 |
Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Aug 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Cunningham, Russell John |
1 Cruickshank Crescent Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
24 Nov 2008 - 08 Aug 2013 |
Individual | Cunningham, Russell John |
Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
05 Oct 2004 - 24 Aug 2022 |
Individual | Cunningham, Andree Dawn |
1 Cruickshank Crescent Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
24 Nov 2008 - 08 Aug 2013 |
Andree Dawn Cunningham - Director
Appointment date: 05 Oct 2004
Address: Windsor, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Nov 2021
Address: Rosedale, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Nov 2009
Alex Russell Cunningham - Director
Appointment date: 27 Oct 2016
Address: Rd 4, Invercargill, 9874 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Oct 2016
Address: Rd 4, Invercargill, 9874 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Oct 2019
Kate Louise Tiriaere - Director
Appointment date: 27 Oct 2016
Address: Rd 9, Invercargill, 9879 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Nov 2021
Address: Rd 9, Invercargill, 9879 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Oct 2016
Russell John Cunningham - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Oct 2004
Termination date: 23 Aug 2013
Address: Rosedale, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Nov 2009
Schist Holdings Limited
173 Spey Street
Northern Southland Engineering Limited
173 Spey Street
Symonds Street Trust Services Limited
173 Spey Street
Turntru Machining Limited
173 Spey Street
N J Architectural Design Limited
173 Spey Street
Ronaki (southland) Limited
173 Spey Street