Jumping Tangents Limited, a registered company, was launched on 14 Mar 2005. 9429034936733 is the number it was issued. This company has been run by 2 directors: Catherine Therese Davis - an active director whose contract began on 14 Mar 2005,
Timothy Lawrence Davis - an active director whose contract began on 14 Mar 2005.
Last updated on 25 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 136 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 (category: registered, physical).
Jumping Tangents Limited had been using 136 Spey Street, Invercargill, Invercargill as their registered address up to 06 Mar 2019.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Little Brown House Limited - located at 9810, Invercargill, Invercargill.
Previous addresses
Address: 136 Spey Street, Invercargill, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Aug 2016 to 06 Mar 2019
Address: 46 Don Street, Invercargill, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 Feb 2015 to 26 Aug 2016
Address: 46 Don Street, Invercargill, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Registered address used from 02 Feb 2015 to 26 Aug 2016
Address: Lexicon House, 123 Spey Street, Invercargill New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Nov 2006 to 02 Feb 2015
Address: Lexicon House, 123 Spey Street, Invercargill New Zealand
Physical address used from 06 Nov 2006 to 20 Feb 2015
Address: C/-fraser Powrie Solicitors, 5 Fenton Street, Eden Terrace, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 04 Jul 2006 to 06 Nov 2006
Address: 5 Fenton Street, Eden Terrace, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 14 Mar 2005 to 04 Jul 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 08 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Little Brown House Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032642063 |
Invercargill Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
26 Feb 2010 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Davis, Catherine Therese |
Wanaka |
14 Mar 2005 - 28 Jul 2009 |
Individual | Davis, Timothy Lawrence |
Wanaka |
14 Mar 2005 - 28 Jul 2009 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Catherine Therese Davis - Director
Appointment date: 14 Mar 2005
Address: Wanaka, Wanaka, 9305 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Sep 2010
Timothy Lawrence Davis - Director
Appointment date: 14 Mar 2005
Address: Wanaka, Wanaka, 9305 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Sep 2010
Peter Laurie Building Contractor Limited
136 Spey Street
Bdo Invercargill Limited
136 Spey Street
Brian Nicoll Engineering (2004) Limited
136 Spey Street
Invercargill Motorpainters Limited
136 Spey Street
Clyde Village Vineyard Limited
136 Spey Street
Grose Investments Limited
136 Spey Street