Shun Da Enterprises Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 21 Feb 2005. 9429034930632 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been run by 2 directors: Kim Lien Lam - an active director whose contract began on 21 Feb 2005,
Phuoc Thuan Lam - an active director whose contract began on 04 Mar 2011.
Updated on 14 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 910B Mt Eden Road, Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 (category: registered, physical).
Shun Da Enterprises Limited had been using 6-8 Lorne Street, Auckland as their registered address up to 05 Jun 2019.
More names used by this company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 05 Oct 2017 to 16 Dec 2019 they were named Wan Xiang Fa Limited, from 04 Mar 2011 to 05 Oct 2017 they were named Pho Saigon Limited and from 21 Feb 2005 to 04 Mar 2011 they were named South Vietnam Restaurant Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders (4 groups). The first group includes 200 shares (20%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 100 shares (10%). Finally the next share allocation (500 shares 50%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 6-8 Lorne Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 09 Jul 2012 to 05 Jun 2019
Address #2: 2 Halifax Avenue, Epsom, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Jun 2009 to 09 Jul 2012
Address #3: 372 Hillsborough Road, Mt Roskill, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 21 Feb 2005 to 04 Jun 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 28 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Individual | Lam, My Tran |
Epsom Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
04 Mar 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Lam, Peter |
Epsom Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
04 Mar 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Lam, Phuoc Thuan |
Epsom Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
04 Mar 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Individual | Lam, Kim Lien |
Epsom Auckland New Zealand |
21 Feb 2005 - |
Kim Lien Lam - Director
Appointment date: 21 Feb 2005
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Address used since 29 May 2010
Phuoc Thuan Lam - Director
Appointment date: 04 Mar 2011
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Mar 2011
Mf Auckland Cbd Limited
6-8 Lorne Street
Chinj Holdings Limited
Apartment 2301, 6 Lorne Street
Pro Code (nz) Limited
Unit 2302
Futurescape Limited
2804/6 Lorne Street
'this Is It' Limited
2002/ 6 Lorne Street
Bible And Medical Missionary Fellowship
Academy Building