Radiochick Limited was incorporated on 08 Mar 2005 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429034897560. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Jay-Jay Harvey - an active director whose contract started on 08 Mar 2005,
Jay-Jay Feeney - an active director whose contract started on 08 Mar 2005.
According to BizDb's data (last updated on 15 Sep 2024), the company registered 3 addresses: Level 1, 1 Jervois Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 (physical address),
Level 1, 1 Jervois Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 (registered address),
Level 1, 1 Jervois Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 (service address),
4 Kingsley Street, Westmere, Auckland, 1022 (postal address) among others.
Until 28 Mar 2022, Radiochick Limited had been using 202 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 1 share is allotted to 1 group (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 1 share is held by 2 entities, namely:
Harvey, Dominic Mark (an individual) located at Freemans Bay, Auckland postcode 1011,
Feeney, Jay-Jay (a director) located at Eden Terrace, Auckland postcode 1010. Radiochick Limited has been categorised as "Radio or television presenter" (ANZSIC R900248).
Principal place of activity
Flat 204, 19 Surrey Crescent, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 202 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Mar 2011 to 28 Mar 2022
Address #2: C/-johnston Associates, 202 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 26 Apr 2006 to 16 Mar 2011
Address #3: 4 Kingsley Street, Westmere, Auckland
Physical address used from 18 Apr 2006 to 26 Apr 2006
Address #4: Www.radiochick.co.nz, Website
Registered address used from 08 Mar 2005 to 26 Apr 2006
Address #5: 12a Westmoreland Street East, Grey Lynn, Auckland
Physical address used from 08 Mar 2005 to 18 Apr 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 05 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Harvey, Dominic Mark |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
13 Mar 2023 - |
Director | Feeney, Jay-jay |
Eden Terrace Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
10 Feb 2020 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Harvey, Jay-jay |
Westmere Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
25 May 2010 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Individual | Feeney, Jacqulyn-joanne Barbara |
Westmere Auckland |
08 Mar 2005 - 15 Apr 2006 |
Jay-jay Harvey - Director
Appointment date: 08 Mar 2005
Address: Westmere, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Jan 2006
Jay-jay Feeney - Director
Appointment date: 08 Mar 2005
Address: Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jan 2021
Address: Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Jan 2019
Elevate Sign Installation Limited
202 Ponsonby Road
Jomic Limited
202 Ponsonby Road
Vintage 6 Limited
202 Ponsonby Road
Pennant & Triumph Limited
202 Ponsonby Road
Abel Tasman One Limited
202 Ponsonby Road
S & F Thorpe Limited
202 Ponsonby Road
Brown Stuff Limited
5/2 Westwood Terrace
Dan Aux Limited
50 Randolph Street
It's All Good Limited
Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street
Lose Promotions Limited
Flat 2, 8 Basque Road
Supermedia Limited
41 Dorset Street
The New Bloom Limited
122a Jervois Road