Avala Limited, a registered company, was started on 29 Mar 2005. 9429034871690 is the number it was issued. The company has been run by 5 directors: Rozalia Vlajkovic - an active director whose contract started on 29 Mar 2005,
Srdjan Vlajkovic - an active director whose contract started on 29 Mar 2005,
Rosalia Vlajkovic - an active director whose contract started on 29 Mar 2005,
Ivana Matic-Stancin - an inactive director whose contract started on 29 Mar 2005 and was terminated on 20 Jul 2007,
Zoran Matic - an inactive director whose contract started on 29 Mar 2005 and was terminated on 20 Jul 2007.
Updated on 28 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 54 Bankside Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 (type: registered, service).
Avala Limited had been using 30 Fancourt Street, Meadowbank, Auckland as their physical address up to 16 Apr 2018.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 10 shares (10 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 90 shares (90 per cent).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 54 Bankside Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 12 Apr 2024
Principal place of activity
62 Bluegrey Avenue, Stonefields, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 30 Fancourt Street, Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 23 Apr 2014 to 16 Apr 2018
Address #2: 733a Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Mar 2005 to 23 Apr 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 03 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Vlajkovic, Rosalia |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 New Zealand |
29 Mar 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 90 | |||
Individual | Vlajkovic, Srdjan |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 New Zealand |
29 Mar 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Matic, Zoran |
St Heliers Auckland |
29 Mar 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Matic-stancin, Ivana |
St Heliers Auckland |
29 Mar 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Rozalia Vlajkovic - Director
Appointment date: 29 Mar 2005
Address: Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Apr 2024
Address: Stonefields, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Apr 2018
Srdjan Vlajkovic - Director
Appointment date: 29 Mar 2005
Address: Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Apr 2024
Address: Stonefields, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Apr 2018
Address: Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Dec 2013
Rosalia Vlajkovic - Director
Appointment date: 29 Mar 2005
Address: Stonefields, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Apr 2018
Address: Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Dec 2013
Ivana Matic-stancin - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Mar 2005
Termination date: 20 Jul 2007
Address: St Heliers, Auckland,
Address used since 29 Mar 2005
Zoran Matic - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Mar 2005
Termination date: 20 Jul 2007
Address: St Heliers, Auckland,
Address used since 29 Mar 2005
Altiora Associates Limited
64 Bluegrey Avenue
John Harris Trust Company Limited
54 Bluegrey Avenue
Yyz International Limited
25 Guyon Street
Nrg Group Limited
76 Bluegrey Avenue
Tincan It Services Limited
36 Wynne Gray Avenue
Baduca Limited
36 Wynne Gray Avenue