Sgtc Property Limited, a registered company, was registered on 29 Jul 2005. 9429034643679 is the business number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Shelley Megan Clark - an active director whose contract started on 29 Jul 2005,
Gregory Andrew Clark - an active director whose contract started on 29 Jul 2005.
Last updated on 09 Jun 2022, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 16 Southwark Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (category: registered, physical).
Sgtc Property Limited had been using Unit F, Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue, Addington, Christchurch as their registered address until 10 Nov 2021.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 999 shares (99.9 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (0.1 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: Unit F, Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Apr 2019 to 10 Nov 2021
Address: Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 24 Mar 2017 to 05 Apr 2019
Address: Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Feb 2014 to 24 Mar 2017
Address: 28b Moorhouse Avenue, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Apr 2011 to 05 Feb 2014
Address: Level 16, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 24 Oct 2007 to 12 Apr 2011
Address: Mckenzie Revis & Associates Limited, Level 3, 329 Durham Street, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 29 Jul 2005 to 24 Oct 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 21 Mar 2022
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 999 | |||
Individual | Gregory Andrew Clark |
Halswell Christchurch New Zealand |
29 Jul 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Shelley Megan Clark |
Halswell Christchurch New Zealand |
29 Jul 2005 - |
Shelley Megan Clark - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jul 2005
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Oct 2006
Gregory Andrew Clark - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jul 2005
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Oct 2006
Awuko Abrasives Limited
Level 1, 259 Lincoln Rd
Cancrete Group Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
People Puzzle Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
Savage Heat Exchangers Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
Cancrete Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
Ab Property Services Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue