Woko Services Limited was started on 16 Sep 2005 and issued an NZBN of 9429034548837. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 4 directors: Wendy Irene Oswin - an active director whose contract started on 16 Sep 2005,
Kevin Michael Oswin - an active director whose contract started on 02 Feb 2010,
Tracey Dawn Roberts - an inactive director whose contract started on 30 Jan 2007 and was terminated on 02 Feb 2010,
Shayne Giles - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 Sep 2005 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2007.
According to our information (updated on 07 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: an address for share register at 119 Lincoln Park Avenue, Massey, Auckland, 0614 (type: other, shareregister).
Up to 04 Nov 2013, Woko Services Limited had been using Unit 3, 6 Westgate Drive, Westgate, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb identified more names for this company: from 31 Jan 2007 to 28 Jul 2015 they were called Quilters Dream Limited, from 16 Sep 2005 to 31 Jan 2007 they were called The Quilt Shop Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Oswin, Kevin (an individual) located at Massey, Auckland postcode 0614.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Oswin, Wendy Irene - located at Massey, Auckland. Woko Services Limited is categorised as "Awning installation or repair" (ANZSIC E323910).
Principal place of activity
119 Lincoln Park Avenue, Massey, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Unit 3, 6 Westgate Drive, Westgate, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Nov 2012 to 04 Nov 2013
Address #2: Unit 3, 6 Westgate Drive, Westgate, Waitakere City New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Apr 2007 to 01 Nov 2012
Address #3: 35 Pearn Place, Northcote, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 16 Sep 2005 to 16 Apr 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 02 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Oswin, Kevin |
Massey Auckland 0614 New Zealand |
02 Feb 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Oswin, Wendy Irene |
Massey Auckland 0614 New Zealand |
16 Sep 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Roberts, Tracey Dawn |
Massey |
08 Apr 2007 - 08 Apr 2007 |
Individual | Giles, Shayne |
Riverhead |
16 Sep 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Wendy Irene Oswin - Director
Appointment date: 16 Sep 2005
Address: Massey, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Oct 2011
Kevin Michael Oswin - Director
Appointment date: 02 Feb 2010
Address: Massey, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Oct 2011
Tracey Dawn Roberts - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Jan 2007
Termination date: 02 Feb 2010
Address: Massey, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jan 2007
Shayne Giles - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Sep 2005
Termination date: 01 Apr 2007
Address: Riverhead,
Address used since 16 Sep 2005
Ttz Contractors Limited
111a Lincoln Park Avenue
Tow Limited
20 Northridge Terrace
Samoa Youths Charitable Trust
14 Sunpark Place
Phone & Internet Services Limited
42 Donovan Avenue
St Pauls Kindergarten Parent Teachers Friends Association Incorporated
162a Waimumu Road
Island Origin Limited
128 Waimumu Road
H & B Holdings Limited
5 Nutsey Avenue
Inshelter Limited
11 Columbia Road
Outdoor Structures Limited
26 Powell Street
Retractable Pergolas Limited
Level 2, Bupa House, 5-7 Kingdon Street
Shadescape Limited
26 Totara Road
W.g.l.r. Limited
10 Toheroa Street