Shields Bros Panel & Paint (Browns Bay) Limited, a registered company, was started on 22 Sep 2005. 9429034528051 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been run by 3 directors: Jason Christopher Shields - an active director whose contract started on 22 Sep 2005,
Christopher Albert Shields - an active director whose contract started on 22 Sep 2005,
Grant Jason Shields - an active director whose contract started on 22 Sep 2005.
Last updated on 26 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 731 Beach Road, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 (category: physical, registered).
Other names used by the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 22 Sep 2005 to 13 Jan 2021 they were called Browns Bay Panelbeaters Limited.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Shields Brothers Holdings Limited - located at 0630, Browns Bay, North Shore City.
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 13 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Shields Brothers Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034527870 |
Browns Bay North Shore City 0630 New Zealand |
22 Sep 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Shields, Jason Christopher |
Rothesay Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
10 Aug 2012 - 01 Oct 2013 |
Entity | Sw Trust Services (thirteen) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030378322 Company Number: 4226598 |
13 Jun 2013 - 01 Oct 2013 | |
Entity | Harbour St Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037607548 Company Number: 955570 |
22 Sep 2005 - 10 Aug 2012 | |
Entity | Harbour St Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037607548 Company Number: 955570 |
22 Sep 2005 - 10 Aug 2012 | |
Entity | Sw Trust Services (thirteen) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030378322 Company Number: 4226598 |
13 Jun 2013 - 01 Oct 2013 | |
Director | Shields, Jason Christopher |
Rothesay Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
14 Jun 2013 - 01 Oct 2013 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Jason Christopher Shields - Director
Appointment date: 22 Sep 2005
Address: Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Oct 2023
Address: Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Mar 2013
Christopher Albert Shields - Director
Appointment date: 22 Sep 2005
Address: Rd 4, Albany, 0794 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Nov 2015
Grant Jason Shields - Director
Appointment date: 22 Sep 2005
Address: Rd 3, Coatesville, 0793 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2019
Address: Riverhead, Riverhead, 0820 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Nov 2016
Shields Bros Panel & Paint (silverdale) Limited
731 Beach Road
Chrisrow Trustee Limited
731 Beach Road
Shields Brothers Holdings Limited
731 Beach Road
Shields Bros Panel & Paint (albany) Limited
731 Beach Road
East Coast Bays European Limited
731 Beach Road
Shields Bros Panel & Paint (glenfield) Limited
731 Beach Road