Onlyfoods Limited, a registered company, was registered on 29 Nov 2005. 9429034456309 is the NZBN it was issued. "Takeaway food retailing" (business classification H451260) is how the company was categorised. This company has been managed by 3 directors: Rex Lindsay Dowling - an active director whose contract started on 29 Nov 2005,
Jonathan Dowling - an active director whose contract started on 05 Aug 2023,
Raewyn Patricia Dowling - an inactive director whose contract started on 29 Nov 2005 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2018.
Last updated on 05 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 2 addresses the company uses, specifically: 92 Horoeka Street, Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt, 5019 (registered address),
92 Horoeka Street, Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt, 5019 (service address),
1 Kapuranga Grove, Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt, 5019 (physical address).
Onlyfoods Limited had been using 1 Kapuranga Grove, Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt as their registered address until 14 Aug 2023.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 1000 shares) - Dowling, Jonathan - located at 5019, Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt.
Principal place of activity
1 Kapuranga Grove, Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1 Kapuranga Grove, Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 11 Jan 2017 to 14 Aug 2023
Address #2: 27 Ava Street, Petone, Lower Hutt, 5012 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Nov 2005 to 11 Jan 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 30 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Dowling, Jonathan |
Stokes Valley Lower Hutt 5019 New Zealand |
05 Aug 2023 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Dowling, Rex Lindsay |
Petone Lower Hutt |
29 Nov 2005 - 05 Aug 2023 |
Individual | Dowling, Raewyn Patricia |
Petone Lower Hutt |
29 Nov 2005 - 04 Aug 2023 |
Rex Lindsay Dowling - Director
Appointment date: 29 Nov 2005
Address: Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2016
Jonathan Dowling - Director
Appointment date: 05 Aug 2023
Address: Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Aug 2023
Raewyn Patricia Dowling - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Nov 2005
Termination date: 31 Mar 2018
Address: Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2016
The First Samoan Full Gospel Pentecostal Church (stokes Valley) Trust Board
151 Stokes Valley Road
The First Samoan Full Gospel Pentecostal Church (titahi Bay) Trust Board
151 Stokes Valley Road
The First Samoan Full Gospel Pentecostal Church (mangere) Trust Board
151 Stokes Valley Road
The First Samoan Full Gospel Pentecostal Church (onehunga) Trust Board
151 Stokes Valley Road
First Samoan Full Gospel Pentecostal Church, New Zealand
151 Stokes Valley Road
The First Samoan Full Gospel Pentecostal Church (hastings) Trust Board
151 Stokes Valley Road
Hayashi New Zealand Limited
14 Cottle Street
Jjpb Limited
132 George Street
Joe's Food World Limited
302 Oxford Terrace
L Taylor Limited
42 Pinehaven Road
Naenae Cafe Limited
22 Rainey Grove
Pak Nz Limited
7 Hewer Crescent