Pondebosa Properties Limited, a registered company, was started on 02 Nov 2005. 9429034453124 is the number it was issued. "Building, residential - renting or leasing - other than holiday" (ANZSIC L671120) is how the company has been classified. The company has been run by 2 directors: Patricia Ann Boase - an active director whose contract began on 02 Nov 2005,
Owen Michael Boase - an active director whose contract began on 02 Nov 2005.
Updated on 16 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, registered).
Pondebosa Properties Limited had been using Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland as their physical address up to 19 Nov 2013.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Lbb Trading Trust - located at 1023, Conifer Grove, Takanini.
Principal place of activity
20 Chippewa Place, Conifer Grove, Auckland, 2112 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 14 Jun 2013 to 19 Nov 2013
Address: Level 6/135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Jul 2011 to 14 Jun 2013
Address: 32 Wairere Rd, The Gardens, Manukau 2105 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 May 2009 to 15 Jul 2011
Address: 191a Hill Rd, The Gardens, Manukau 2105
Registered & physical address used from 08 Jul 2008 to 22 May 2009
Address: 64 Stratford Road, Manurewa, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 02 Nov 2005 to 08 Jul 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 01 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Other (Other) | Lbb Trading Trust |
Conifer Grove Takanini 2112 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2020 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Other | Lbb Trading Trust | 05 Jul 2020 - 05 Jul 2020 | |
Director | Boase, Patricia Ann |
Conifer Grove Takanini 2112 New Zealand |
05 Aug 2019 - 05 Jul 2020 |
Individual | Boase, Patricia Ann |
Manukau Auckland New Zealand |
02 Nov 2005 - 20 Jul 2011 |
Individual | Boase, Owen Michael |
Conifer Grove Takanini 2112 New Zealand |
02 Nov 2005 - 05 Jul 2020 |
Individual | Boase, Owen Michael |
Conifer Grove Takanini 2112 New Zealand |
02 Nov 2005 - 05 Jul 2020 |
Patricia Ann Boase - Director
Appointment date: 02 Nov 2005
Address: Conifer Grove, Takanini, 2112 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Feb 2015
Owen Michael Boase - Director
Appointment date: 02 Nov 2005
Address: Conifer Grove, Takanini, 2112 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Feb 2015
Arnott's New Zealand Limited
Level 1, 61-73 Davis Crescent
Cornwall Trustees 73 Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Cornwall Trustees 72 Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Auckland Plumbers Group Limited
Level 4, 19 Morgan Street
Your Property Services Limited
Level 4, 19 Morgan Street
Grovers Investments Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Burmont Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Computer Family Trustee Limited
Level 3, 135 Broadway
Hlh Property Investments Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Matt Hine Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Pc Investments (2007) Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Twincl Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway