Nkc Developments Limited, a registered company, was registered on 23 Jan 2006. 9429034369067 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been run by 3 directors: Thomas Frank Smit - an active director whose contract began on 23 Jan 2006,
Henry John Rothery - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Jan 2006 and was terminated on 12 Jan 2011,
Howard Smit - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Jan 2006 and was terminated on 03 May 2007.
Last updated on 25 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 7-9 Mccoll Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (category: registered, physical).
Nkc Developments Limited had been using C/-Ascent Business Directions, 7-9 Mccoll Street, Newmarket, Auckland as their registered address up to 07 Sep 2011.
All shares (1012500 shares exactly) are under control of a single group consisting of 2 entities, namely:
Smit, Thomas Frank (an individual) located at Titirangi, Auckland,
Smit, Sheryl Anne (an individual) located at Titirangi, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address #1: C/-ascent Business Directions, 7-9 Mccoll Street, Newmarket, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 Jun 2007 to 07 Sep 2011
Address #2: C/-ascent Business Dierctions, Level 5, 145 Symonds Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 23 Jan 2006 to 20 Jun 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1012500
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 16 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1012500 | |||
Individual | Smit, Thomas Frank |
Titirangi Auckland New Zealand |
23 Jan 2006 - |
Individual | Smit, Sheryl Anne |
Titirangi Auckland New Zealand |
23 Jan 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Kay-sharman, Michele |
Titirangi Auckland New Zealand |
23 Jan 2006 - 07 Jun 2017 |
Individual | Worsley, Alice Joyce |
Titirangi Auckland New Zealand |
23 Jan 2006 - 03 Oct 2014 |
Individual | Smit, Howard |
Titirangi Auckland |
23 Jan 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Entity | A B D Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036934003 Company Number: 1132372 |
23 Jan 2006 - 07 Dec 2012 | |
Entity | A B D Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036934003 Company Number: 1132372 |
23 Jan 2006 - 07 Dec 2012 | |
Individual | Rothery, Henry John |
Otorohanga |
23 Jan 2006 - 03 Oct 2014 |
Thomas Frank Smit - Director
Appointment date: 23 Jan 2006
Address: Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jan 2006
Henry John Rothery - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jan 2006
Termination date: 12 Jan 2011
Address: Otorohanga, 3900 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jan 2006
Howard Smit - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jan 2006
Termination date: 03 May 2007
Address: Titirangi, Auckland,
Address used since 23 Jan 2006
Ellah Limited
Suite 1, 7 Mccoll Street
Btjm Limited
Suite 1, 7 Mccoll Street
Giggles And Scribbles Early Learning Centre Limited
Suite 1, 7 Mccoll Street
Quisteq Rentals Limited
Suite 1, 7 Mccoll Street
Mediatribe Limited
7-9 Mccoll Street
Bc Mechanical Limited
7-9 Mccoll Street