Skyborne Limited, a registered company, was started on 13 Feb 2006. 9429034312346 is the business number it was issued. "Film and video production" (business classification J551110) is how the company has been classified. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Lesley-Joan Stone - an active director whose contract began on 13 Feb 2006,
Alexander Paget Stone - an active director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2009.
Last updated on 18 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 4 Muritai Road, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 (category: registered, physical).
Skyborne Limited had been using 330 Cowan Bay Road, Warkworth as their physical address until 07 Nov 2018.
Former names used by this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 13 Feb 2006 to 25 Jan 2012 they were named Sustainability Uptake Research Group Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Principal place of activity
4 Muritai Road, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 330 Cowan Bay Road, Warkworth, 0983 New Zealand
Physical address used from 16 May 2016 to 07 Nov 2018
Address: 330 Cowan Bay Road, Warkworth, Warkworth, 0983 New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 May 2016 to 16 May 2016
Address: 330 Cowan Bay Road, Warkworth, 0983 New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 May 2016 to 07 Nov 2018
Address: 330 Cowan Bay Road, Warkworth, Warkworth, 0983 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Apr 2016 to 13 May 2016
Address: 46 Tiri View Rd, Waiheke Island New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Feb 2006 to 13 May 2016
Address: 46 Tiri View Rd, Waiheke Island New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Feb 2006 to 06 Apr 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 28 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Stone, Lesley-joan |
Rd 3 Warkworth 0983 New Zealand |
13 Feb 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Stone, Alexander Paget |
Ostend Waiheke Island 1081 New Zealand |
04 Mar 2010 - |
Lesley-joan Stone - Director
Appointment date: 13 Feb 2006
Address: Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Oct 2018
Address: Pohuehue, Warkworth, 0983 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Mar 2016
Alexander Paget Stone - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2009
Address: Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Oct 2018
Address: Pohuehue, Warkworth, 0983 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Mar 2016
Otata Limited
359 Cowan Bay Road
La Petite Ferme Trustee Company Limited
200 Cowan Bay Road
Amo Media Limited
3 Opahi Bay Road
Beachfront Productions Limited
51 Morrison Drive
Offroad Addiction Limited
183 Sandspit Road
Swoon Limited
17 Elizabeth Street
Symphony Limited
431 Mahurangi East Road
Transformer Film & T.v. Services Limited
126b Clayden Road