Dual Construction Limited, a registered company, was started on 04 Apr 2006. 9429034253878 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Blair George Wilkins - an active director whose contract began on 04 Apr 2006,
Wendy Leigh Wilkins - an inactive director whose contract began on 04 Apr 2006 and was terminated on 15 Mar 2018.
Last updated on 22 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, 8 Church Street, Queenstown, 9300 (type: physical, registered).
Dual Construction Limited had been using 35 Riverside Road, Frankton, Queenstown as their physical address up until 03 Dec 2015.
Old names for this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 14 Feb 2011 to 11 Sep 2013 they were called Onsite Welders and Construction Limited, from 04 Apr 2006 to 14 Feb 2011 they were called Onsite Welders Limited.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 1000 shares) - Wilkins, Blair George - located at 9300, Lower Shotover, Queenstown.
Previous addresses
Address: 35 Riverside Road, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 28 Aug 2014 to 03 Dec 2015
Address: Level 1, 13 Camp Street, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 24 Apr 2014 to 28 Aug 2014
Address: C/-whk, Level 1, 13 Camp Street, Queenstown 9300 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Dec 2009 to 24 Apr 2014
Address: W H K Cook Adam Ward Wilson, First Floor, 50 Stanley Street, Queenstown 9300
Registered & physical address used from 27 Jun 2008 to 10 Dec 2009
Address: W H K Cook Adam, First Floor, 50 Stanley Street, Queenstown 9300
Physical & registered address used from 04 May 2007 to 27 Jun 2008
Address: Cook Adam & Co, 1st Floor, Chamber Suites, 50 Stanley Street, Queenstown
Physical & registered address used from 04 Apr 2006 to 04 May 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 30 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Wilkins, Blair George |
Lower Shotover Queenstown 9304 New Zealand |
04 Apr 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Wilkins, Wendy Leigh |
Rd 1 Queenstown 9371 New Zealand |
04 Apr 2006 - 23 Apr 2018 |
Blair George Wilkins - Director
Appointment date: 04 Apr 2006
Address: Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2015
Wendy Leigh Wilkins - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Apr 2006
Termination date: 15 Mar 2018
Address: Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2015
Taylormade Plumbing & Solar Limited
8 Church Street
Codyandco Limited
8 Church Street
Golden Qt Limited
Level 1
Unit 7 Limited
Level 1
Artektus Limited
1st Floor
Queenstown Trustees Limited
1st Floor