Weymouth Mcleod Limited, a registered company, was started on 05 Apr 2006. 9429034191262 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Wayne Eric Charlton - an active director whose contract started on 05 Apr 2006,
Michele Charlton - an active director whose contract started on 05 Apr 2006.
Updated on 18 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 19 Treeway, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2020 (category: physical, registered).
Weymouth Mcleod Limited had been using 185 Marua Road, Ellerslie, Auckland as their registered address up until 10 Aug 2020.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group includes 998 shares (99.8%) held by 3 entities. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (0.1%). Finally the 3rd share allotment (1 share 0.1%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address: 185 Marua Road, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Jul 2013 to 10 Aug 2020
Address: 185 Marua Road, Ellerslie, Auckland 1051 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Dec 2008 to 18 Jul 2013
Address: 130 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 01 May 2006 to 04 Dec 2008
Address: 23 Manor Park, Pakuranga, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 05 Apr 2006 to 01 May 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 01 Jul 2021
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 998 | |||
Individual | Ding, Christine Henrietta Sue |
Saint Johns Auckland 1072 New Zealand |
11 Sep 2015 - |
Individual | Charlton, Wayne Eric |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
05 Apr 2006 - |
Individual | Charlton, Michele |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
05 Apr 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Charlton, Michele |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
05 Apr 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Charlton, Wayne Eric |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
05 Apr 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Miller, Andrew Philip |
Sunnyhills Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2012 - 11 Sep 2015 |
Wayne Eric Charlton - Director
Appointment date: 05 Apr 2006
Address: Pakuranga, Auckland 2010, New Zealand
Address used since 28 Aug 2009
Michele Charlton - Director
Appointment date: 05 Apr 2006
Address: Pakuranga, Auckland 2010, New Zealand
Address used since 28 Aug 2009
Navin Hira & Co Limited
185 Marua Road
Swainston & Associates Trustee Co Limited
185 Marua Road
Msut Holdings Nz Limited
185 Marua Road
P W Construction Limited
185 Marua Road
Newstart 14 Limited
185 Marua Road
Alert Locksmiths Limited
185b Marua Road