Abacus St02 Limited was registered on 27 Jun 2006 and issued an NZBN of 9429034023723. The registered LTD company has been run by 7 directors: William James Johnstone - an active director whose contract started on 27 Jun 2006,
Susan Jayne Johnstone - an active director whose contract started on 27 Jun 2006,
Susan Gaye Cowie - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jun 2013,
Tracey Katherine Murray - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jun 2021,
Jeffrey Robert Seymour - an inactive director whose contract started on 27 Jun 2006 and was terminated on 01 Jun 2021.
As stated in BizDb's information (last updated on 18 Sep 2021), the company uses 1 address: 102 Clyde Street, Balclutha, Balclutha, 9230 (category: registered, physical).
Until 20 Sep 2011, Abacus St02 Limited had been using C/-Shand Thomson Ltd, 102 Clyde Street, Balclutha as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 3 groups (3 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 33 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Susan Cowie (a director) located at Rd 1, Lawrence postcode 9591.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 33 per cent shares (exactly 33 shares) and includes
William Johnstone - located at Balclutha, Balclutha.
The next share allotment (34 shares, 34%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Susan Johnstone, located at Balclutha, Balclutha (an individual).
Previous addresses
Address: C/-shand Thomson Ltd, 102 Clyde Street, Balclutha New Zealand
Physical address used from 27 Jun 2006 to 20 Sep 2011
Address: 102 Clyde Street, Balclutha New Zealand
Registered address used from 27 Jun 2006 to 20 Sep 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 01 Jul 2021
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 33 | |||
Director | Susan Gaye Cowie |
Rd 1 Lawrence 9591 New Zealand |
04 Jun 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 33 | |||
Individual | William James Johnstone |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
27 Jun 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 34 | |||
Individual | Susan Jayne Johnstone |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
27 Jun 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Jeffrey Robert Seymour |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
27 Jun 2006 - 24 Sep 2020 |
Individual | William Garnett Thomson |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
27 Jun 2006 - 05 Jun 2015 |
Individual | Brian Robert Dodds |
Balclutha |
27 Jun 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
William James Johnstone - Director
Appointment date: 27 Jun 2006
Address: Balclutha, Balclutha, 9230 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2010
Susan Jayne Johnstone - Director
Appointment date: 27 Jun 2006
Address: Balclutha, Balclutha, 9230 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2010
Susan Gaye Cowie - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jun 2013
Address: Rd 1, Lawrence, 9591 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2013
Tracey Katherine Murray - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jun 2021
Address: Balclutha, Balclutha, 9230 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2021
Jeffrey Robert Seymour - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Jun 2006
Termination date: 01 Jun 2021
Address: Balclutha, 9230 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2015
William Garnett Thomson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Jun 2006
Termination date: 01 Jun 2015
Address: Balclutha, 9230 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jun 2006
Brian Robert Dodds - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Jun 2006
Termination date: 31 May 2007
Address: Balclutha,
Address used since 27 Jun 2006
Sanson Farming Co Limited
102 Clyde Street
Tim White Electrical Limited
102 Clyde Street
Glensdale Limited
102 Clyde Street
Clarke Agri Limited
102 Clyde Street
Hewitt Dairy Enterprises Limited
102 Clyde Street
Trk Farm Limited
102 Clyde Street