Oggi Limited, a registered company, was launched on 18 Jul 2006. 9429034015766 is the number it was issued. This company has been run by 2 directors: Gordon Vickers Frykberg - an active director whose contract started on 18 Jul 2006,
Andrew Stewart Graeme Mcintosh - an inactive director whose contract started on 18 Jul 2006 and was terminated on 17 Aug 2007.
Last updated on 23 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 7, Southern Cross Building, 61 High Street, Auckland (type: registered, physical).
Former names used by this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 29 Sep 2009 to 07 Apr 2020 they were named Oggi Digital Limited, from 18 Jul 2006 to 29 Sep 2009 they were named Moving Tactics Nz Limited.
All shares (2041 shares exactly) are owned by a single group consisting of 2 entities, namely:
Frykberg, Gordon Vickers (a director) located at Ponsonby, Auckland postcode 1011,
Bendall & Cant Trustee Company Limited (an entity) located at Southern Cross Building, 61 High Street, Auckland, Null.
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 2041
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 01 Dec 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 2041 | |||
Director | Frykberg, Gordon Vickers |
Ponsonby Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
28 Sep 2011 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Bendall & Cant Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038482182 |
Southern Cross Building 61 High Street, Auckland Null New Zealand |
28 Sep 2011 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Masterson, Martyn Kenneth |
Epsom Auckland New Zealand |
27 Nov 2009 - 17 May 2011 |
Entity | Quadrent Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036308491 Company Number: 1243474 |
31 Jul 2009 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Individual | Getley, Tony Alan |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2009 - 17 May 2011 |
Other | Null - Moving Tactics Pty Limited | 18 Jul 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Oggi Advertising Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039182807 Company Number: 482620 |
18 Jul 2006 - 28 Sep 2011 | |
Entity | Quadrent Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036308491 Company Number: 1243474 |
31 Jul 2009 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Other | Moving Tactics Pty Limited | 18 Jul 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Oggi Advertising Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039182807 Company Number: 482620 |
18 Jul 2006 - 28 Sep 2011 |
Gordon Vickers Frykberg - Director
Appointment date: 18 Jul 2006
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Aug 2020
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Jun 2011
Andrew Stewart Graeme Mcintosh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Jul 2006
Termination date: 17 Aug 2007
Address: 60 North Steyne, Manly, Nsw,australia,
Address used since 18 Jul 2006
Capital Medical Assessments Limited
Level 7, Southern Cross Building
The New Zealand Symphony Orchestra Foundation
Level 3
Orthophobia Properties Limited
L8 Southern Cross Building
Hennessey Consultants Limited
L8 Southern Cross Building
Trautz Consulting Limited
7th Floor, Southern Cross Building
Solanki Jogia Properties Limited
L8 Southern Cross Building