Vernon Road Orchard Limited was started on 12 Jul 2006 and issued a business number of 9429033995793. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Brigid Hitchcock - an active director whose contract started on 12 Jul 2006,
Brandon Peter Hitchcock - an active director whose contract started on 12 Jul 2006.
According to our information (last updated on 16 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: 13 Mclean Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, physical).
Until 05 Oct 2020, Vernon Road Orchard Limited had been using Level 6 Harrington House, 32 Harington Street, Tauranga as their registered address.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 1 group (3 shareholders in total). In the first group, 1000 shares are held by 3 entities, namely:
Hitchcock, Brigid (an individual) located at Rd 1, Tauranga 3171,
Hitchcock, Brandon Peter (an individual) located at Rd 1, Tauranga 3171,
Vernon Road Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga, Tauranga postcode 3110.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 6 Harrington House, 32 Harington Street, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 09 Jun 2016 to 05 Oct 2020
Address: Level 6 Harrington House, Harington Street, Tauranga New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Jul 2008 to 09 Jun 2016
Address: Wood Walton Chartered Accountants Ltd, 55 Eighth Avenue, Tauranga
Physical & registered address used from 12 Jul 2006 to 15 Jul 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 05 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Hitchcock, Brigid |
Rd 1 Tauranga 3171 New Zealand |
12 Jul 2006 - |
Individual | Hitchcock, Brandon Peter |
Rd 1 Tauranga 3171 New Zealand |
12 Jul 2006 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Vernon Road Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048601948 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
10 Nov 2020 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Cooper, Richard Allan |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
19 Mar 2009 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Entity | Wood Walton Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036970513 Company Number: 1123308 |
12 Jul 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Wood Walton Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036970513 Company Number: 1123308 |
12 Jul 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Brigid Hitchcock - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jul 2006
Address: Rd 1, Tauranga, 3171 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2016
Brandon Peter Hitchcock - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jul 2006
Address: Rd 1, Tauranga, 3171 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2016
Liquid Pictures Limited
Level 6 Harrington House
Cryotherapy Nz Limited
Level 6 Harrington House
Apartment 404 Limited
Level 6 Harrington House
Southvine Holdings Limited
Level 6 Harrington House
J K Hamilton Trustee Company (no. 2) Limited
The Offices Of J K Hamilton
Tauranga Urology Research Limited
Level 6 Harrington House