Jereth Limited was registered on 25 Aug 2006 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429033935003. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Wayne Noble - an active director whose contract began on 25 Aug 2006,
Sandra Noble - an active director whose contract began on 25 Aug 2006.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 31 Jul 2024), the company registered 1 address: 7 Alpa Street, Cromwell, 9310 (types include: physical, registered).
Until 16 Dec 2020, Jereth Limited had been using Rapid 180, State Highway 8B, Cromwell as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Noble, Sandra (an individual) located at Cromwell postcode 9310.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Noble, Wayne - located at Cromwell. Jereth Limited is categorised as "Business consultant service" (ANZSIC M696205).
Previous addresses
Address: Rapid 180, State Highway 8b, Cromwell, 9310 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Jul 2020 to 16 Dec 2020
Address: 202 Marine Drive, Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013 New Zealand
Physical address used from 12 Jun 2020 to 03 Jul 2020
Address: 202 Marine Drive, Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013 New Zealand
Registered address used from 03 Dec 2019 to 03 Jul 2020
Address: 202 Marine Drive, Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013 New Zealand
Physical address used from 02 Dec 2019 to 12 Jun 2020
Address: 202 Marine Drive, Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013 New Zealand
Registered address used from 02 Dec 2019 to 03 Dec 2019
Address: 180 State Highway 8b, Cromwell, Cromwell, 9310 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Nov 2019 to 02 Dec 2019
Address: 211 Ripponvale Road, Rd 2, Cromwell, 9384 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Nov 2016 to 01 Nov 2019
Address: 10 Aurum Court, Cromwell, 9310 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 25 Aug 2006 to 15 Nov 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 05 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Noble, Sandra |
Cromwell 9310 New Zealand |
25 Aug 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Noble, Wayne |
Cromwell 9310 New Zealand |
25 Aug 2006 - |
Wayne Noble - Director
Appointment date: 25 Aug 2006
Address: Cromwell, 9310 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2020
Address: Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Nov 2019
Address: Rd 2, Cromwell, 9384 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2016
Sandra Noble - Director
Appointment date: 25 Aug 2006
Address: Cromwell, 9310 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2020
Address: Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Nov 2019
Address: Rd 2, Cromwell, 9384 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2016
Central Concrete Placing Limited
118 Ord Road
Sales Results Limited
115 Ord Road
Communitiesnz Limited
3 Matthews Crescent
Enterprise Consulting Limited
61b The Mall
Falcon Trading Limited
106 Felton Road
Ignition Business Solutions Limited
18 Pisa Road
Mary Hinsen Imagery Limited
118 Barry Avenue
Svg Enterprises Limited
C/- Mead & Stark