Morning Star Properties Limited was launched on 16 Oct 2006 and issued a number of 9429033824475. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Clinton Roger Stokes - an active director whose contract began on 16 Oct 2006,
Melanie Joy Stokes - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 Oct 2006 and was terminated on 10 May 2013.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 16 Aug 2024), this company filed 1 address: Level 7, 55 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (category: physical, service).
Until 28 Jan 2019, Morning Star Properties Limited had been using Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 120 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Stokes, Melanie Joy (an individual) located at Kelvin Heights, Queenstown postcode 9300.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 99.17% shares (exactly 119 shares) and includes
Stokes, Clinton Roger - located at Kelvin Heights, Queenstown.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Sep 2017 to 28 Jan 2019
Address: Level 12, 17 Albert Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Apr 2016 to 06 Sep 2017
Address: Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Apr 2015 to 19 Apr 2016
Address: 10 Maheke Street, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 Jun 2013 to 16 Apr 2015
Address: 26 Newell Street, Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 May 2013 to 07 Jun 2013
Address: C/-moody & Moody Limited, 15 Mersey Street, Gore 9710 New Zealand
Registered address used from 15 Mar 2010 to 20 May 2013
Address: C/-moody & Moody Limited, 15 Mersey Street, Gore, 9710 New Zealand
Physical address used from 15 Mar 2010 to 20 May 2013
Address: C/-moody & Moody Limited, Level 2, 36 Shotover Street, Queenstown, 9300
Registered & physical address used from 16 Oct 2006 to 15 Mar 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 04 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Stokes, Melanie Joy |
Kelvin Heights Queenstown 9300 New Zealand |
16 Oct 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 119 | |||
Individual | Stokes, Clinton Roger |
Kelvin Heights Queenstown 9300 New Zealand |
16 Oct 2006 - |
Clinton Roger Stokes - Director
Appointment date: 16 Oct 2006
Address: Kelvin Heights, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Mar 2020
Address: Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Mar 2017
Melanie Joy Stokes - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Oct 2006
Termination date: 10 May 2013
Address: Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Apr 2008
S.c. Johnson & Son Proprietary Limited
Level 8, 79 Queen St
Nicholls & Maher (nz) Limited
Level 4, Bdo Centre, 4 Graham Street
D M Dunningham Limited
Level 29, 188 Quay Street
Mj Wyborn Ventures Limited
Level 5, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue
Corvus Oteha Valley Joint Venture Limited
Level 4, 52 Symonds Street
Corvus New Zealand Limited
Level 4, 52 Symonds Street