Ericksen Classic Cars Limited, a registered company, was registered on 19 Oct 2006. 9429033802916 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Kim Marise Ericksen - an active director whose contract began on 19 Oct 2006,
Mark Justin Ericksen - an active director whose contract began on 19 Oct 2006.
Last updated on 16 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company uses, namely: 36 Bridge Street, Ahuriri, Napier, 4110 (registered address),
21B Seapoint Road, Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 (service address),
21B Seapoint Road, Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 (physical address),
Performance Accounting Limited, 56 Franklin Road, Rd 3, Napier, 4183 (other address) among others.
Ericksen Classic Cars Limited had been using 21B Seapoint Road, Bluff Hill, Napier as their service address up until 09 Oct 2023.
Previous names for this company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 19 Oct 2006 to 29 Sep 2022 they were named Ericksen Developments Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 21b Seapoint Road, Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Service address used from 09 Oct 2023
Previous addresses
Address #1: 21b Seapoint Road, Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Service address used from 05 Oct 2021 to 09 Oct 2023
Address #2: 56 Franklin Road, Rd 3, Napier, 4183 New Zealand
Registered address used from 08 Oct 2018 to 09 Oct 2023
Address #3: 56 Franklin Road, Rd 3, Napier, 4183 New Zealand
Physical address used from 08 Oct 2018 to 05 Oct 2021
Address #4: 56 Franklin Road, Rd 3, Napier, 4183 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Aug 2012 to 08 Oct 2018
Address #5: Pricewaterhousecoopers, Chartered Accountants, 36 Munroe Street, Napier 4110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Sep 2009 to 08 Aug 2012
Address #6: Pricewaterhousecoopers, Cnr Raffles & Munroe Streets, Napier 4140
Registered & physical address used from 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Sep 2009
Address #7: C/-staples Rodway, 205 Hastings Street Sth, Hastings
Registered & physical address used from 19 Oct 2006 to 20 Nov 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 03 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Ericksen, Mark Justin |
Bluff Hill Napier 4110 New Zealand |
19 Oct 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Ericksen, Kim Marise |
Bluff Hill Napier 4110 New Zealand |
19 Oct 2006 - |
Kim Marise Ericksen - Director
Appointment date: 19 Oct 2006
Address: Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2010
Address: Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Sep 2021
Address: Napier, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Sep 2015
Mark Justin Ericksen - Director
Appointment date: 19 Oct 2006
Address: Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2010
Address: Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Sep 2021
Address: Napier, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Sep 2015
Performance Accounting Limited
56 Franklin Road
Roger Anderson Limited
56 Franklin Road
Almond Engine Developments Limited
56 Franklin Road
Ericksen Motorcycle & Marine Limited
56 Franklin Road
Morgan Financial Solutions Limited
56 Franklin Road
Morgan Educare Centre Limited
56 Franklin Road