Redd Nz Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 12 Mar 2007. 9429033605333 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Commission selling service" (business classification G432010) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been run by 5 directors: Grace Yang - an active director whose contract started on 23 Feb 2009,
Jason Kang - an inactive director whose contract started on 23 Feb 2009 and was terminated on 04 Jan 2024,
Hyun Joo Yang - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Nov 2007 and was terminated on 24 Feb 2009,
Phil Kang - an inactive director whose contract started on 24 Dec 2007 and was terminated on 24 Feb 2009,
Phil Kang - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 Mar 2007 and was terminated on 06 Nov 2007.
Last updated on 20 Jul 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 2 addresses the company registered, specifically: 4A Spencer Road, Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 (registered address),
4A Spencer Road, Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 (service address),
Flat 2, 10 Ondine Place, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 (physical address).
Redd Nz Limited had been using Flat 2, 10 Ondine Place, Glenfield, Auckland as their service address up until 15 Jan 2024.
Past names used by the company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 12 Mar 2007 to 10 Feb 2014 they were called 070 New Zealand Limited.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 1000 shares) - Yang, Grace - located at 0632, Pinehill, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
13 Thornton Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Flat 2, 10 Ondine Place, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Service & registered address used from 10 Dec 2018 to 15 Jan 2024
Address #2: 13 Thornton Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 27 Jul 2012 to 10 Dec 2018
Address #3: 21a Brook Street, Milford, North Shore, 0620 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Dec 2007 to 27 Jul 2012
Address #4: 21a Brook Street, Milford, North Shore New Zealand
Physical address used from 21 Dec 2007 to 27 Jul 2012
Address #5: 39a Killybegs Drive, Albany, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 12 Mar 2007 to 21 Dec 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 11 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Yang, Grace |
Pinehill Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
04 May 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Kang, Jason |
Pinehill Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
04 May 2007 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Kang, Jason |
Pinehill Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
04 May 2007 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Kang, Phil |
Albany Auckland |
12 Mar 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Grace Yang - Director
Appointment date: 23 Feb 2009
Address: Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Dec 2023
Address: Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Dec 2018
Address: Milford, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jul 2012
Jason Kang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Feb 2009
Termination date: 04 Jan 2024
Address: Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Dec 2023
Address: Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Dec 2018
Address: Milford, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Jul 2012
Hyun Joo Yang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Nov 2007
Termination date: 24 Feb 2009
Address: Milford, North Shore, 0620,
Address used since 16 Dec 2007
Phil Kang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Dec 2007
Termination date: 24 Feb 2009
Address: Milford, North Shore 0620,
Address used since 24 Dec 2007
Phil Kang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Mar 2007
Termination date: 06 Nov 2007
Address: Albany, Auckland,
Address used since 12 Mar 2007
Imam Ali Institute
2/17 Thornton Road
Quarry Point Limited
11 Wairau Road
Design Delivery Solutions Limited
6 Brook Street
Atlas Tilt Slab Limited
11 Wairau Road
Atlas Concrete Limited
11 Wairau Road
Atlas Quarries Limited
11 Wairau Road
A Plum Tree Trading Limited
119a Kitchener Rd
Camman Trading Limited
Flat 2, 42 Diana Drive
Dc Sales Limited
5a Rarere Road
Good Shepherd Financial Services Limited
Suite 10, 145 Kitchener Road
Ink Limited
Peter Kendall Ltd
Scp Limited
56 Archers Road