Empower Business and Accounting Solutions Limited was incorporated on 22 Feb 2007 and issued an NZ business number of 9429033579559. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Trevor John Huett - an active director whose contract began on 22 Feb 2007,
Louise Huett - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2009 and was terminated on 14 Feb 2014.
As stated in our database (last updated on 16 Jul 2024), the company registered 1 address: Level 1, 3 Cobham Avenue, Kerikeri, 0245 (types include: office, delivery).
Until 02 Mar 2012, Empower Business and Accounting Solutions Limited had been using 107 Keri Downs Road, Kerikeri, 0294 as their registered address.
BizDb identified previous aliases used by the company: from 22 Feb 2007 to 21 Mar 2016 they were called Financial Control Systems Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 10 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Huett, Louise Mary (an individual) located at Rd1, Kerikeri postcode 0294.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 90% shares (exactly 90 shares) and includes
Huett, Trevor John - located at Rd1, Kerikeri. Empower Business and Accounting Solutions Limited has been categorised as "Business consultant service" (business classification M696205).
Principal place of activity
Level 1, 3 Cobham Avenue, Kerikeri, 0245 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 107 Keri Downs Road, Kerikeri, 0294 New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 Apr 2007 to 02 Mar 2012
Address #2: 107 Keri Downs Road, Kerikeri, 0294 New Zealand
Physical address used from 10 Apr 2007 to 10 Apr 2007
Address #3: 57 Riverview Road, Kerikeri, 0470
Physical & registered address used from 22 Feb 2007 to 10 Apr 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 28 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Huett, Louise Mary |
Rd1 Kerikeri 0294 New Zealand |
22 Feb 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 90 | |||
Individual | Huett, Trevor John |
Rd1 Kerikeri 0294 New Zealand |
22 Feb 2007 - |
Trevor John Huett - Director
Appointment date: 22 Feb 2007
Address: Rd1, Kerikeri, 0294 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Feb 2012
Louise Huett - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2009
Termination date: 14 Feb 2014
Address: Rd 1, Kerikeri, 0294 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Jan 2010
Seagate Holdings Limited
71 Morris Lane
Seagate Investment Limited
71 Morris Lane
Ahu Whakamua Limited
284 Kapiro Road
Habitat Limited
49d Mccaughan Road
Karanto Management Services Limited
45 Conifer Lane
Living Soul 2015 Limited
282 Kapiro Road
Watledge Consulting (nz) Limited
86 Riverstream Drive
Wharepapa Landholdings Limited
900b Pungaere Road