Dowling Family Trustee Limited, a registered company, was registered on 26 Mar 2007. 9429033508696 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 4 directors: Sean Paul Dowling - an active director whose contract started on 13 Mar 2012,
Fiona Kim Dowling - an active director whose contract started on 13 Mar 2012,
Yvonne Mary Dowling - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Mar 2007 and was terminated on 23 Mar 2012,
Kevin Leo Dowling - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Mar 2007 and was terminated on 23 Mar 2012.
Updated on 23 Jul 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 197 Cumberland Drive, Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210 (types include: physical, service).
Dowling Family Trustee Limited had been using 6 Sumner Tc, Aotea, Wellington as their registered address until 22 Oct 2019.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 6 Sumner Tc, Aotea, Wellington, 5024 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 Nov 2012 to 22 Oct 2019
Address: 41 Glenross Street, Glenross, Dunedin New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Mar 2007 to 07 Nov 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 09 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Dowling, Fiona Kim |
Flagstaff Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
30 Oct 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Dowling, Sean Paul |
Aotea Porirua 5024 New Zealand |
30 Oct 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Dowling, Yvonne Mary |
Glenross Dunedin |
26 Mar 2007 - 30 Oct 2012 |
Individual | Dowling, Kevin Leo |
Glenross Dunedin |
26 Mar 2007 - 30 Oct 2012 |
Sean Paul Dowling - Director
Appointment date: 13 Mar 2012
Address: Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2019
Address: Aotea, Porirua, 5024 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Mar 2012
Fiona Kim Dowling - Director
Appointment date: 13 Mar 2012
Address: Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2019
Address: Aotea, Porirua, 5024 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Mar 2012
Yvonne Mary Dowling - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Mar 2007
Termination date: 23 Mar 2012
Address: Glenross, Dunedin, 9011 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Oct 2009
Kevin Leo Dowling - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Mar 2007
Termination date: 23 Mar 2012
Address: Glenross, Dunedin, 9011 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Oct 2009
Jr International Trading Limited
29 Paparoa Crescent
Paparoa 2010 Limited
28 Paparoa Crescent
Harvest Pine Limited
27 Sumner Terrace
Clearwood Investments Limited
27 Sumner Terrace
Vm Rentals Limited
22 Kaimai Place
8 Infinitum Limited
32 Paparoa Crescent