May Family Holdings Limited, a registered company, was registered on 21 May 2007. 9429033386829 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Kevin Ronald May - an active director whose contract started on 21 May 2007,
Paula Michelle May - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 May 2007 and was terminated on 30 Apr 2015.
Updated on 02 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: Corner Of Church and Selwyn Streets, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 (type: registered, physical).
May Family Holdings Limited had been using Corner Of Church and Selwyn Streets, Onehunga as their physical address until 11 Apr 2011.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - May, Kevin Ronald - located at 1061, One Tree Hill, Auckland.
Previous address
Address #1: Corner Of Church And Selwyn Streets, Onehunga New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 21 May 2007 to 11 Apr 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 18 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | May, Kevin Ronald |
One Tree Hill Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
21 May 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | May, Paula Michelle |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
21 May 2007 - 06 Oct 2015 |
Kevin Ronald May - Director
Appointment date: 21 May 2007
Address: One Tree Hill, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Apr 2018
Address: Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Apr 2015
Paula Michelle May - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 May 2007
Termination date: 30 Apr 2015
Address: Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Apr 2012
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited
Level 6, 59 High Street
Maui Finance Limited
Level 10, 34 Shortland Street
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited
Level 14, 34 Shortland Street
Lzy Trustee Company Limited
Level 1, 2 Princes Street
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited
Level 29, 188 Quay Street
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited
Level 15, 126 Vincent Street