Claridge Trustees Limited, a registered company, was registered on 16 May 2007. 9429033384245 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been managed by 8 directors: David William Pratt - an active director whose contract began on 29 Apr 2020,
Russell Alan Bixley - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Aug 2016 and was terminated on 30 Apr 2020,
Rodney Thomas Guy - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Aug 2016 and was terminated on 30 Apr 2020,
Michael Henry Woodward - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Sep 2011 and was terminated on 09 Aug 2016,
Tania Elizabeth King - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Sep 2011 and was terminated on 08 Aug 2016.
Last updated on 03 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company uses, namely: 6/42 Kouka Road, Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 (registered address),
6/42 Kouka Road, Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 (service address),
42 Kouka Road, Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 (physical address).
Claridge Trustees Limited had been using 42 Kouka Road, Beachlands, Auckland as their registered address until 08 Dec 2023.
Other names for this company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 16 May 2007 to 30 Sep 2011 they were called A.r. & J.a. Lovett Trustees Limited.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 1 share) - Pratt, David William - located at 2018, Maraetai, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 42 Kouka Road, Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 19 Apr 2021 to 08 Dec 2023
Address #2: 33 Coles Crescent, Papakura, Papakura, 2110 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 May 2020 to 19 Apr 2021
Address #3: 33 Coles Crescent, Papakura, Papakura, 2110 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Aug 2016 to 08 May 2020
Address #4: 109 Blenheim Road, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Nov 2012 to 15 Aug 2016
Address #5: C/-mackay Bailey Butchard Ltd, 81 Treffers Road, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 Mar 2011 to 05 Nov 2012
Address #6: C/-mackay Bailey Butchard Ltd, Level 4, 262 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 16 May 2007 to 30 Mar 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 06 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Pratt, David William |
Maraetai Auckland 2018 New Zealand |
01 May 2020 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | R B A Trustees (2016) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042209430 Company Number: 5897029 |
Papakura Papakura 2110 New Zealand |
07 Aug 2016 - 01 May 2020 |
Individual | Cox, Wynton Gill |
Christchurch |
16 May 2007 - 30 Sep 2011 |
Entity | Mbb Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033019925 Company Number: 2061977 |
30 Sep 2011 - 07 Aug 2016 | |
Entity | R B A Trustees (2016) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042209430 Company Number: 5897029 |
Papakura Papakura 2110 New Zealand |
07 Aug 2016 - 01 May 2020 |
Entity | Mbb Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033019925 Company Number: 2061977 |
30 Sep 2011 - 07 Aug 2016 |
David William Pratt - Director
Appointment date: 29 Apr 2020
Address: Maraetai, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Apr 2020
Address: Maraetai, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Apr 2020
Russell Alan Bixley - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Aug 2016
Termination date: 30 Apr 2020
Address: Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Aug 2016
Rodney Thomas Guy - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Aug 2016
Termination date: 30 Apr 2020
Address: Rd 1, Papakura, 2580 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2019
Address: Clarks Beach, Clarks Beach, 2122 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Aug 2016
Michael Henry Woodward - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Sep 2011
Termination date: 09 Aug 2016
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 02 May 2012
Tania Elizabeth King - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Sep 2011
Termination date: 08 Aug 2016
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 02 May 2012
James William Nell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Sep 2011
Termination date: 08 Aug 2016
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 02 May 2012
Harold Geoffrey Bailey - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Sep 2011
Termination date: 01 Jan 2013
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 02 May 2012
Wynton Gill Cox - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 May 2007
Termination date: 30 Sep 2011
Address: Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 16 May 2007
Gellerts Limited
33 Coles Crescent
N P Baker Limited
33 Coles Crescent
Gft Trustee Limited
33 Coles Crescent
Cowen Trading Limited
33 Coles Crescent
Nz Homes Limited
33 Coles Crescent
Cougar Engineering Limited
33 Coles Crescent