Palmheads Limited, a registered company, was started on 15 Jun 2007. 9429033369099 is the NZBN it was issued. "Internet publishing and broadcasting" (ANZSIC J570010) is how the company was categorised. The company has been run by 2 directors: Daryn William Hanright - an active director whose contract began on 15 Jun 2007,
Yongxin Hanright - an active director whose contract began on 18 Mar 2022.
Updated on 13 Sep 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 225 Richmond Hill Road, Richmond Hill, Christchurch, 8081 (types include: registered, service).
Palmheads Limited had been using 14A Algie Place, Avonhead, Christchurch as their registered address up to 10 May 2011.
A total of 500 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 250 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 250 shares (50 per cent).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 225 Richmond Hill Road, Richmond Hill, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 11 May 2023
Principal place of activity
71 Toorak Avenue, Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 14a Algie Place, Avonhead, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Mar 2009 to 10 May 2011
Address #2: 10 Westgrove Avenue, Avonhead, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 15 Jun 2007 to 11 Mar 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 500
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 27 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | Hanright, Yongxin |
Richmond Hill Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
22 Apr 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | Hanright, Daryn William |
Richmond Hill Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
15 Jun 2007 - |
Daryn William Hanright - Director
Appointment date: 15 Jun 2007
Address: Richmond Hill, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 03 May 2023
Address: Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 02 May 2011
Yongxin Hanright - Director
Appointment date: 18 Mar 2022
Address: Richmond Hill, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 03 May 2023
Address: Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Mar 2022
Archer Embedded Systems Limited
19 Harrowdale Drive
Reformed Church Of Dovedale Trust Board
40 Camberwell Place
Bridge Holdings Limited
32 Hillcrest Place
Financial Service Providers Nz Limited
4 Storry Place
Triple R Investments Limited
4 Storry Place
Weusten Brothers Limited
4 Storry Place
Aero Spares Limited
Level 1
Doin' Better Business Limited
25 Bevington Street
New Zealand Messengers Limited
386 Memorial Avenue
Nzhi Limited
31 Longmuir Street
Scarfy Limited
158 Ilam Road
Southern Aircraft Sales Limited
Level 1